EP3008774 - MAGNETIC SHIELDING FOR AN ANTENNA, USING A COMPOSITE BASED ON THIN MAGNETIC LAYERS, AND ANTENNA COMPRISING SUCH A SHIELDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADENOT ENGELVIN, Anne Lise 1 Rue Joseph Thierry F-37230 Luynes / FR | 02 /
DUBOURG, Sébastien 9 Rue les jardins du Vallon F-37320 Esvres / FR | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14731212.8 | 12.06.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014EP62250 | Priority number, date | FR20130055562 | 14.06.2013 Original published format: FR 1355562 | [2016/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014198832 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3008774 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/22, G06K19/077, H01Q17/00, H05K9/00 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
H01F27/366 (EP,US);
H01Q7/06 (US);
H01F27/36 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2225 (EP,US);
H01Q1/526 (US);
H01Q17/00 (EP,US);
G06K19/07771 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE ABSCHIRMUNG FÜR EINE ANTENNE, UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES VERBUNDSTOFFS AUF BASIS DÜNNER MAGNETISCHER SCHICHTEN, UND ANTENNE MIT SOLCH EINER ABSCHIRMUNG | [2016/16] | English: | MAGNETIC SHIELDING FOR AN ANTENNA, USING A COMPOSITE BASED ON THIN MAGNETIC LAYERS, AND ANTENNA COMPRISING SUCH A SHIELDING | [2016/16] | French: | BLINDAGE MAGNETIQUE D'ANTENNE UTILISANT UN COMPOSITE A BASE DE COUCHES MINCES MAGNETIQUES ET ANTENNE COMPRENANT UN TEL BLINDAGE | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 21.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/10] | 03.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0425350 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [Y] 2 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 45 * * column 5, line 8 - column 8, line 23 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 1,3-12; | [IY]JP2005006263 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [I] 1,3-12 * abstract * * pages 8,9 * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 2; | [A]US2009040126 (INOUE TETSUO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0033] - [0058] * * page 8 ** figures 1-4 * | Examination | WO2011068695 | US2007221297 | US2008303735 |