EP3032969 - PRODUCE RIPENING CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garratt, Alan Unit 3 Dolphin Way West Thurrock Essex RM19 1NZ / GB | [2016/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURBITT, Neil 51 Temple Way Rayleigh Essex SS6 9PP / GB | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Harrison IP Limited Westminster Business Centre 10 Great North Way Nether Poppleton York YO26 6RB / GB | ||
Former [2016/25] | Harrison IP Limited Box Tree House Northminster Business Park Northfield Lane York YO26 6QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14733366.0 | 05.06.2014 | [2016/25] | WO2014IB61983 | Priority number, date | EP20130180570 | 15.08.2013 Original published format: EP 13180570 | [2016/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015022588 | Date: | 19.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3032969 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3032969 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A23B7/152, A23N15/06, A23B7/144, F25D11/00 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
A23B7/152 (EP,US);
A23N15/06 (EP,US);
F25D11/003 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/25] | A23N15/06, A23B7/144, F25D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRODUKTREIFUNGSKAMMER | [2016/25] | English: | PRODUCE RIPENING CHAMBER | [2016/25] | French: | CHAMBRE DE MATURATION DE PRODUCTION | [2016/36] |
Former [2016/25] | CHAMBRE DE MÛRISSEMENT POUR PRODUITS AGRICOLES | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 27.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2014 | AL | 01.03.2017 | AT | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | MK | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | RS | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | SM | 01.03.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | LU | 05.06.2017 | MT | 05.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 05.06.2014 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
MT | 05.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 05.06.2014 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
MT | 05.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.06.2014 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
MT | 05.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
MT | 05.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5475926 (BOLKESTEIN JACOBUS [NL], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 44; figure - *; | [Y]US5531158 (PERRYMAN JR OWEN J [US]) [Y] 1,5-7 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 12 * * column 4, line 14 - column 6, line 27; figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [XI]WO9739639 (COOL CARE LTD [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9 * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 26; figures 2,3A,3B,4,14,15 * * page 9, line 11 - page 14, line 11 * * page 15, line 9 - line 17 * [I] 3-5,8; | [Y]WO9957020 (TRANS TECH HOLDINGS GROUP [US]) [Y] 1,5-7 * page 12, line 11 - line 25; figures 2,3 * * page 17, line 4 - page 18, line 8; figure 4 * * page 21, line 19 - line 25 * * page 23, line 8 - page 25, line 11; figures 8-10 * * page 27, line 6 - line 19; figures 12,15 *; | [XI]JP2003009835 (DOHWATECH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [I] 3,5-9; | [X]US7913513 (BOTTOM KENNETH H [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 28; figure 5; claim 15 * * column 2, line 16 - line 19 * |