EP2987314 - ECHO SUPPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHGREN, Per c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 14733862.8 | 29.05.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014US39872 | Priority number, date | GB20130009777 | 31.05.2013 Original published format: GB 201309777 | US201314015998 | 30.08.2013 Original published format: US201314015998 | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014194012 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2987314 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2987314 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04M9/08 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
H04M9/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ECHOUNTERDRÜCKUNG | [2016/08] | English: | ECHO SUPPRESSION | [2016/08] | French: | SUPPRESSION D'ÉCHO | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 10.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2014 | AL | 27.09.2017 | AT | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | DK | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | ES | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | IT | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | MK | 27.09.2017 | PL | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | RS | 27.09.2017 | SE | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | SM | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | NO | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | IE | 29.05.2018 | LU | 29.05.2018 | MT | 29.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 29.05.2014 | |
AT | 27.09.2017 | ||
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
MT | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 29.05.2014 | |
AT | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
MT | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
MT | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
MT | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
MT | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 29.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | |
NO | 27.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2011081026 (RAMAKRISHNAN DINESH [US], et al) [Y] 2-8 * paragraphs [0090] - [0093] *[A] 1,10; | [XY]WO2012109385 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0033] , [0056] , [0063] - [0069] - [0073] , [0074]; figures 3a,3b,4 * [Y] 2-8; | [XA]WO2012166092 (GOOGLE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0061] - [0064]; figure 4 * [A] 2-8 |