EP3052445 - GUANIDINE-FUNCTIONALIZED METAL SILICATE PARTICLES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SUCH PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KSHIRSAGAR, Manjiri 3M Center Post Office Box 3327 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
GRIESGRABER, George W. 3M Center Post Office Box 3327 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14734683.7 | 04.06.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014US40861 | Priority number, date | US201361884254P | 30.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361884254 P | [2016/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015047464 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3052445 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3052445 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/20, C01B33/22, C01B33/26, C09C1/28, C09C3/12, C12Q1/04, C12Q1/24, D04H13/00, G01N1/40, B01D39/06 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
C01B33/20 (EP,US);
G01N1/4077 (US);
B01D39/06 (US);
C01B33/22 (EP,US);
C01B33/26 (EP,US);
C07F7/10 (US);
C12Q1/24 (EP,US);
D04H13/00 (US);
D10B2403/02421 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/32] | C01B33/20, C01B33/22, C01B33/26, D04H1/00, C09C1/28, C09C3/12, C12Q1/04, G01N1/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GUANIDINFUNKTIONALISIERTE METALLSILIKATPARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG SOLCHER PARTIKEL | [2016/32] | English: | GUANIDINE-FUNCTIONALIZED METAL SILICATE PARTICLES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SUCH PARTICLES | [2016/32] | French: | PARTICULES DE SILICATE DE MÉTAL À FONCTION GUANIDINE ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION DE TELLES PARTICULES | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 14.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2014 | AL | 03.01.2018 | AT | 03.01.2018 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | DK | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | ES | 03.01.2018 | FI | 03.01.2018 | HR | 03.01.2018 | IT | 03.01.2018 | LT | 03.01.2018 | LV | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | MK | 03.01.2018 | NL | 03.01.2018 | PL | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | RS | 03.01.2018 | SE | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | SM | 03.01.2018 | TR | 03.01.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | NO | 03.04.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | GB | 04.06.2018 | IE | 04.06.2018 | LU | 04.06.2018 | MT | 04.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | FR | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 04.06.2014 | |
AL | 03.01.2018 | ||
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 04.06.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
MT | 04.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 04.06.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
MT | 04.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 04.06.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
MT | 04.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 04.06.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
MT | 04.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 04.06.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 04.06.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 03.01.2018 | |
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6031119 (LEE BYUNG-HYOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 14,16,19* abstract *; | [A]US2010297053 (HIRUKAWA TOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1,8 * claims 21-40 *; | [A]WO2012078426 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 1,14,16,19,20 * claims 1,2-4,10,12,13,14,19,21,23,26 *; | [A] - FARIA E A ET AL, "Tetramethylguanidine covalently bonded onto silica gel surface as an efficient and reusable catalyst for transesterification of vegetable oil", APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 338, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.APCATA.2007.12.021, ISSN 0926-860X, (20080401), pages 72 - 78, (20080103), XP026130229 [A] 1-3,8 * page 73 - page 74 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apcata.2007.12.021 | [A] - KRAMER J ET AL, "Guanidinium functionalised silica-based anion exchangers significantly improve the selectivity of platinum group metal recovery from process solutions", SEPARATION AND PURIFICATION TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 49, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.SEPPUR.2005.09.004, ISSN 1383-5866, (20060415), pages 181 - 185, (20060415), XP028035321 [A] 1-3,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.seppur.2005.09.004 | [A] - KIM K-S ET AL, "Preparation of guanidine bases immobilized on SBA-15 mesoporous material and their catalytic activity in knoevenagel condensation", STUDIES IN SURFACE SCIENCE AND CATALYSIS, ELSEVIER B.V, NL, (20030101), vol. 146, doi:10.1016/S0167-2991(03)80432-9, ISSN 0167-2991, pages 505 - 508, XP009104595 [A] 1-3,8 * page 505 - page 506 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-2991(03)80432-9 | [A] - BLANC ALEXANDRE C.ET AL., "The preparation and use of nove immobilised guanidine catalysts in base-catalysed epoxidation and condensation reactions", GREEN CHEMISTRY, (20001109), vol. 2, no. 6, doi:DOI: 10.1039/B005929N, pages 283 - 288, XP002729545 [A] 1-3,8 * page 283 - page 284 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B005929N | by applicant | US6045913 | - 3M COSMETIC MICROSPHERES CM-111, 3M COMPANY | - 3M CERAMIC MICROSPHERES, 3M COMPANY |