EP2989024 - ARRANGEMENT FOR RAPID PREPARATION OF PRODUCTS THAT CAN BE ENCAPSULATED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Folatelli, Patricio Dardo Folatelli, Patricio DardoGeneral Pacheco 231 B1640FEG Martinez, Buenos Aires / AR | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/09] | Application number, filing date | 14734904.7 | 23.04.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014IB60938 | Priority number, date | AR2001P3101425 | 26.04.2013 Original published format: AR P013101425 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014174459 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2989024 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/32, B65D85/816 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
B65D81/3205 (EP,RU,US);
B65D81/3211 (EP,RU,US);
B65D85/816 (EP,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR SCHNELLEN HERSTELLUNG VON VERKAPSELBAREN PRODUKTEN | [2016/09] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR RAPID PREPARATION OF PRODUCTS THAT CAN BE ENCAPSULATED | [2016/09] | French: | AGENCEMENT POUR PRÉPARATION RAPIDE DE PRODUITS QUI PEUVENT ÊTRE ENCAPSULÉS | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 13.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 25.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102007017464 (VIDOLOV KLIMENT [DE]); | [A]US2009092711 (NINH ANDY [US], et al); | [E]WO2014068093 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) | Examination | US2009311389 | EP2774874 |