EP3149851 - UNIT AND METHOD FOR SYNCHRONOUS RECTIFICATION CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 05.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Jun c/o Huawei Technologies Sweden AB Skalholtsgatan 9 S-164 40 Kista / SE | 02 /
TSENGENES, Georgios c/o Huawei Technologies Sweden AB Skalholtsgatan 9 S-164 40 Kista / SE | 03 /
TORRICO-BASCOPE, Grover Victor c/o Huawei Technologies Sweden AB Skalholtsgatan 9 S-164 40 Kista / SE | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstrasse 8 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14736346.9 | 01.07.2014 | [2017/14] | WO2014EP63900 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016000754 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3149851 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/06, H02M1/38, H02M3/158, H03K17/13 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
H03K17/06 (EP);
H02M1/08 (EP);
H03K17/13 (EP);
H02M1/0009 (EP);
H02M1/0012 (EP);
H02M1/38 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Title | German: | EINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR SYNCHRONEN GLEICHRICHTUNGSSTEUERUNG | [2017/14] | English: | UNIT AND METHOD FOR SYNCHRONOUS RECTIFICATION CONTROL | [2017/14] | French: | UNITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE REDRESSEMENT SYNCHRONE | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 27.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/28] | 29.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.07.2020 | 09.07.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004114509 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * * claims 6,7,10 *; | [A]US2013063984 (SANDNER CHRISTOPH [AT], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9952200 (SEMI TECH DESIGN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - WEIYI FENG ET AL, "A Universal Adaptive Driving Scheme for Synchronous Rectification in LLC Resonant Converters", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, USA, (20120801), vol. 27, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TPEL.2012.2184304, ISSN 0885-8993, pages 3775 - 3781, XP011441715 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPEL.2012.2184304 | Examination | WO2004114509 | US2013063984 | WO9952200 | - WEIYI FENG ET AL, "A Universal Adaptive Driving Scheme for Synchronous Rectification in LLC Resonant Converters", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, USA, (20120801), vol. 27, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TPEL.2012.2184304, ISSN 0885-8993, pages 3775 - 3781, XP011441715 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPEL.2012.2184304 | - ZHAO A ET AL, "One-step digital dead-time correction for DC-DC converters", APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION (APEC), 2010 TWENTY-FIFTH ANNUAL IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100221), ISBN 978-1-4244-4782-4, pages 132 - 137, XP031742759 |