EP3019610 - METHODS FOR PERFORMING ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE-MEDIATED EXON SKIPPING IN THE RETINA OF A SUBJECT IN NEED THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Fondation Imagine 24, Boulevard du Montparnasse 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université de Paris 85 boulevard Saint Germain 75006 Paris / FR | For all designated states ASSISTANCE PUBLIQUE-HOPITAUX DE PARIS 55 boulevard Diderot 75012 Paris 12 / FR | [2024/10] |
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Fondation Imagine 24, Boulevard du Montparnasse 75015 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Université de Paris 85 boulevard Saint Germain 75006 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Assistance Publique-Hôpitaux de Paris (APHP) 3, avenue Victoria 75004 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Fondation Imagine 24, Boulevard du Montparnasse 75015 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Université Paris Descartes 12, rue de l'Ecole de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Assistance Publique-Hôpitaux de Paris (APHP) 3, avenue Victoria 75004 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2016/20] | For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Fondation Imagine Institut des Maladies Genetiques 156, rue de Vaugirard 75015 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Université Paris Descartes - Paris V 12, Rue de l'Ecole de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Assistance Publique-Hôpitaux de Paris (APHP) 3, avenue Victoria 75004 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROZET, Jean-Michel Inserm U1163 Imagine 24 Boulevard du Montparnasse 75015 Paris / FR | 02 /
PERRAULT, Isabelle Inserm U1163 Imagine 24 Boulevard du Montparnasse 75015 Paris / FR | 03 /
GERARD, Xavier Inserm U1163 Imagine 24 Boulevard du Montparnasse 75015 Paris / FR | 04 /
KAPLAN, Josseline Inserm U1163 Imagine 24 Boulevard du Montparnasse 75015 Paris / FR | 05 /
MUNNICH, Arnold Inserm U1163 Imagine 24 Boulevard du Montparnasse 75015 Paris / FR | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/19] |
Former [2016/20] | Collin, Matthieu Inserm-Transfert Paris Biopark 7, rue Watt 75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 14737236.1 | 08.07.2014 | [2016/20] | WO2014EP64604 | Priority number, date | EP20130305968 | 08.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13305968 | [2016/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015004133 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3019610 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3019610 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/7088 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
H04L1/00 (EP);
H04L1/1874 (EP);
H04L43/0882 (EP);
H04L47/83 (EP);
H04W28/0205 (EP,KR);
H04W28/0231 (EP);
H04W28/0278 (EP);
H04W72/52 (EP,KR);
H04W72/542 (EP);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3521 (EP,US);
C12N2320/33 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON OLIGONUCLEOTIDVERMITTELTEM ANTISENSE-EXON-SKIPPING IN DER NETZHAUT EINER PERSON, DIE DARAUF ANGEWIESEN IST | [2019/42] | English: | METHODS FOR PERFORMING ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE-MEDIATED EXON SKIPPING IN THE RETINA OF A SUBJECT IN NEED THEREOF | [2016/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER UN SAUT D'EXON INDUIT PAR DES OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES ANTISENS DANS LA RÉTINE D'UN SUJET EN AYANT BESOIN | [2019/42] |
Former [2016/20] | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON OLIGONUKLEOTIDVERMITTELTEM ANTISENSE-EXON-SKIPPING IN DER NETZHAUT EINES DARAUF ANGEWIESENEN SUBJEKTS | ||
Former [2016/20] | PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER DES SAUTS D'EXON MÉDIÉS PAR DES OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES ANTISENS DANS LA RÉTINE D'UN SUJET EN AYANT BESOIN | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 02.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2019 | Observations by third parties | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20168215.0 / EP3702461 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.2021
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.2021
Hoffman Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 23.02.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.07.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.01.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.01.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2014 | AL | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.07.2014 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2012168435 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 9, line 2 - line 5 * * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2013036105 (STICHTING KATHOLIEKE UNIV [NL], et al) [YD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [YD] - XAVIER GERARD ET AL., "AON-mediated exon skipping restores ciliation in fibroblasts harboring the common Leber congenital amaurosis CEP290 mutation", MOLECULAR THERAPY - NUCLEIC ACIDS, (20120601), vol. 1, no. 6, doi:10.1038/mtna.2012.21, ISSN 2162-2531, page e29, XP055088066 [YD] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mtna.2012.21 | [Y] - XAVIER G. et al., "AON-mediated exon skipping restores ciliation in fibroblasts harboring the common Leber congenital amaurosis CEP290 mutation- Supplementary Information", (20120601), URL: http://www.nature.com/mtna/journal/v1/n6/suppinfo/mtna201221s1.html?url=/mtna/journal/v1/n6/full/mtna201221a.html, (20131113), XP002716312 [Y] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mtna.2012.21 | [Y] - ROB WJ COLLIN ET AL., "Antisense Oligonucleotide (AON)-based Therapy for Leber Congenital Amaurosis Caused by a Frequent Mutation in CEP290", MOLECULAR THERAPY - NUCLEIC ACIDS, (20120301), vol. 1, no. 3, doi:10.1038/mtna.2012.3, page e14, XP055088070 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mtna.2012.3 | [Y] - RAKOCZY PIROSKA E. ET AL., "Targeted delivery of an antisense oligonucleotide in the retina: uptake, distribution, stability, and effect", ANTISENSE AND NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEVELOPMENT, (1996), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1087-2906, pages 207 - 213, XP002716313 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/oli.1.1996.6.207 | [Y] - BOCHOT A. ET AL., "Intravitreal administration of antisense oligonucleotides: Potential of liposomal delivery", PROGRESS IN RETINAL AND EYE RESEARCH, (200003), vol. 19, no. 2, ISSN 1350-9462, pages 131 - 147, XP002716314 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1350-9462(99)00014-2 | by applicant | WO2012168435 | - KAPLAN, J. OPHTHALMIC GENET., (2008), vol. 29, pages 92 - 8 | - HOLLANDER, AI ET AL., PROG RETIN EYE RES., (2008), vol. 27, pages 391 - 419 | - DEN HOLLANDER, AI ET AL., AM J HUM GENET., (2006), vol. 79, pages 556 - 61 | - PERRAULT, I ET AL., HUM MUTAT., (2007), vol. 28, page 416 | - TURNER, CSH SYMP. QUANT. BIOL., (1987), vol. 1/7, pages 123 - 133 | - FRIER ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 9373 - 77 | - TURNER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1987), vol. 109, pages 3783 - 3785 | - TAKAGI M; YAGI M; ISHIBASHI K; TAKESHIMA Y; SURONO A; MATSUO M; KOIZUMI M, "Design of 2'-O-Me RNA/ENA chimera oligonucleotides to induce exon skipping in dystrophin pre-mRNA", NUCLEIC ACIDS SYMP SER (OXF, (2004), doi:doi:10.1093/nass/48.1.297, pages 297 - 8, XP003031264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nass/48.1.297 | US20090212384 | other | WO2012168435 | - UEHARA et al., FASEB Journal, (20120920), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 76 - 85 | - ANDRIEU-SOLER et al., Molecular Vision, (20070000), vol. 13, pages 692 - 706 | Opposition | EP0064604 | EP0305968 | WO2012168435 | WO2013036105 | EP2718437 | - Xavier Gerard, Isabelle Perrault, Sylvain Hanein, Eduardo Silva, Karine Bigot, Sabine Defoort-Delhemmes, Marlèene Rio, Arnold Munnich, Daniel Scherman, Josseline Kaplan, Antoine Kichler, Jean-Michel Rozet, "AON-mediated exon skipping restores ciliation in fibroblasts harboring the common Leber congenital amaurosis CEP290 mutation- Supplementary Information", Molecular Therapy-Nucleic Acids, Cell Press, US, US , (20120601), vol. 1, no. 6, doi:10.1038/mtna.2012.21, ISSN 2162-2531, pages E29 - E29-16, XP002716312 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mtna.2012.21 | - Rob Wj Collin, Anneke I Den Hollander, Saskia D Van Der Velde-Visser, Jeannette Bennicelli, Jean Bennett, Frans Pm Cremers, "Antisense Oligonucleotide (AON)-based Therapy for Leber Congenital Amaurosis Caused by a Frequent Mutation in CEP290", Molecular Therapy — Nucleic Acids, (20120301), vol. 1, no. 3, doi:10.1038/mtna.2012.3, page e14, XP055088070 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mtna.2012.3 | - Rakoczy P E, Lai M C, Watson M, Seydel U, Constable I., "Targeted delivery of an antisense oligonucleotide in the retina: uptake, distribution, stability, and effect", PROGRESS IN RETINAL AND EYE RESEARCH, OXFORD, GB, GB , (19960901), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:10.1089/oli.1.1996.6.207, ISSN 1350-9462, pages 207 - 213, XP002716313 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/oli.1.1996.6.207 | - Bochot A, Couvreur P, Fattal E., "Intravitreal administration of antisense oligonucleotides: Potential of liposomal delivery", PROGRESS IN RETINAL AND EYE RESEARCH, OXFORD, GB, GB , (20000301), vol. 19, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S1350-9462(99)00014-2, ISSN 1350-9462, pages 131 - 147, XP002716314 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1350-9462(99)00014-2 | - Feldherr Carl M, Et Al., "The permeability of the nuclear Envelope in Dividing and nondividing cell cultures", The Journal of Cell Biology, (19900701), vol. 111, XP055981225 | - GERARD XAVIER ET AL, "Intravitreal Injection of Splice-switching Oligonucleotides to Manipulate Splicing in Retinal Cells", Pharmacokinetics and Toxicity in Rats and Monkeys of coDbait: A Therapeutic Double-stranded DNA Oligonucleotide Conjugated to Cholesterol, MOLECULAR THERAPY-NUCLEIC ACIDS, VOL. 1, PAGE(S) ARTICLE NO.: E33, (20150901), vol. 4, ISSN 2162-2531(print), page Article No.: e250, XP002788928 | - GARANTO ALEJANDRO ET AL, "In vitro and in vivo rescue of aberrant splicing in CEP290-associated LCA by antisense oligonucleotide delivery", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (20160615), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 2552 - 2563, XP002788931 | - Perrault Issabelle, Et Al., "Spectrum of NPHP6/CEP290 mutations in Leber congenital amaurosis and delineation of the associated phenotype", HUM MUTAT, (20070101), vol. 28, no. 4, XP055981226 | - NOBUYUKI ENDOH, MASATO UEHARA, HAJIME OGATA, ET AL., "SIMPLE MEASUREMENT METHOD OF NONLINEARITY PARAMETER B/A OF TISSUE BY PROPAGATION TIME DIFFERENCE.", Japanese journal of applied physics, Japan Society of Applied Physics, JP, JP , (19880301), vol. 27., no. SUPPL. 27-1., ISSN 0021-4922, pages 76 - 78., XP000036921 | - Andrieu-Soler, Et Al., "Single-stranded oligonucleotide-mediated in vivo gene repair in the rd1 retina", Mol Vis, (20070101), vol. 13, XP055981230 | - Rivka A Rachel;Tiansen Li;Anand Swaroop, "Photoreceptor sensory cilia and ciliopathies: focus on CEP290, RPGR and their interacting proteins", Cilia, BioMed Central Ltd, London, UK, London, UK , (20121203), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1186/2046-2530-1-22, ISSN 2046-2530, page 22, XP021140457 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/2046-2530-1-22 | - Hocine, Et Al., "RNA processing and export", Cold Spring Harbor Perspectives In Biology, (20101201), vol. 2, no. 12, doi:10.1101/cshperspect.a000752, pages 1 - 21, XP055600420 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/cshperspect.a000752 | - Lambert Vincent, Et Al., "Laser-Induced choroidal neovascularization model in mice", Nat Protoc, (20130101), page 2197, XP055981232 | - Lenis Tamara L., Hu Jane, Ng Sze Yin, Jiang Zhichun, Sarfare Shanta, Lloyd Marcia B., Esposito Nicholas J., Samuel William, Jaworski Cynthia, Bok Dean, Finnemann Silvia C., Radeke Monte J., Redmond T. Michael, Travis Gabriel H., Radu Roxana A., "Expression of ABCA4 in the retinal pigment epithelium and its implications for Stargardt macular degeneration", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, (20181120), vol. 115, no. 47, doi:10.1073/pnas.1802519115, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E11120 - E11127, XP055981234 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1802519115 | - Han Zongchao, Makkia Rasha S, Cooper Mark, Naash Muna, "DNA nanoparticle-mediated ABCA4 delivery rescues Stargardt dystrophy in mice Nanoparticle applications in Physics View project Dose reconstruction for late effect studies in radiotherapy. View project", ArticleinThe Journal of clinical investigation, (20120101), vol. 122, no. 9, doi:10.1172/JCI64833·Source:, XP055981239 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI64833·Source: | - Wang, Et Al., "Proteomic evidence that ABCA4 is vital for traumatic proliferative vitreoretinopathy formation and development", Experimental Eye Research, (20190101), vol. 181, XP055981246 | - Fattal, E. Bochot, A., "Ocular delivery of nucleic acids: antisense oligonucleotides, aptamers and siRNA", Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, Elsevier, Amsterdam , NL, Amsterdam , NL , (20061122), vol. 58, no. 11, doi:10.1016/j.addr.2006.07.020, ISSN 0169-409X, pages 1203 - 1223, XP005774959 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2006.07.020 | - Dos Santos Gomess, Et Al., "Intraocular Delivery of Oligonucleotides", CURR PHARM BIOTECHNOL, (20050101), vol. 6, XP055981255 | - Anand Manisha, Et Al., "Ciliary transition zone (TZ) proteins RPGR and CEP290: role in photoreceptor cilia and degenerative diseases", Expert Opin Ther Targets, (20120101), vol. 16, no. 6, XP055981260 | - Cideciyan Artur, Et Al., "Cone photoreceptors are the main targets for gene therapy of NPHP5 (IQCB1) or NPHP6 (CEP290) blindness: generation of an all-cone Nphp6 hypomorph mouse that mimics the human retinal ciliopathy", Human Molecular Genetics, (20110118), vol. 20, no. 7, XP055981269 | - Jazayeri, Et Al., "2013 ARVO Annual Meeting", (20130101), (20221115), XP055981272 | - Artur V. Cideciyan, Malgorzata Swider, Tomas S. Aleman, Yaroslav Tsybovsky, Sharon B. Schwartz, Elizabeth A.M. Windsor, Alejandro J. Roman, Alexander Sumaroka, Janet D. Steinberg, Samuel G. Jacobson, Edwin M. Stone, Krzysztof Palczewski, "ABCA4 disease progression and a proposed strategy for gene therapy", Human Molecular Genetics, Oxford University Press, GB, GB , (20090301), vol. 18, no. 5, doi:10.1093/hmg/ddn421, ISSN 0964-6906, pages 931 - 941, XP055378779 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/ddn421 | - Shah, Et Al., "Acanthocytosis", StatPearls, (20200101), StatPearls, (20221115), XP055981277 |