EP3003608 - METHODS FOR MAKING HOLLOW METAL OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/15] | HOLLOW METAL OBJECTS AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME | ||
[2024/18] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRENTICE, Ian Francis 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | 02 /
OTT, Eric Allen 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | 03 /
WOODFIELD, Andrew Philip 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | [2023/52] |
Former [2016/15] | 01 /
PRENTICE, Ian, Francis 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | ||
02 /
OTT, Eric, Allen 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | |||
03 /
WOODFIELD, Andrew, Philip 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Williams, Andrew Richard Global Patent Operation-Europe GE International Inc The Ark 201 Talgarth Road, Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14737385.6 | 06.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014US41290 | Priority number, date | US201361832439P | 07.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361832439 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014197789 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3003608 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B22F5/00, B22F5/10, B22F5/04, F01D5/14, B22D23/00, C23C24/00, B22C9/10, B22D29/00, F01D5/28, // B22F3/115 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
B22D23/003 (EP,US);
F01D25/005 (US);
B05D1/02 (US);
B22C9/108 (EP,US);
B22D29/001 (EP,US);
B22F5/009 (EP,US);
B22F5/04 (EP,US);
B22F5/10 (EP,US);
F01D5/147 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
F01D9/02 (US);
B22F2005/103 (EP,US);
B22F3/115 (EP,US);
F05D2220/36 (EP,US);
F05D2230/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/47] | B22F5/00, B22F5/10, B22F5/04, F01D5/14, F01D5/18, B22D23/00, C23C24/00, B22C9/10, B22D29/00, F01D5/28 | ||
Former IPC [2016/15] | B22F5/00, B22F5/10, B22F5/04, F01D5/14, B29C41/08, F01D5/18, B22D23/00, C23C24/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HOHLER METALLOBJEKTE | [2024/18] | English: | METHODS FOR MAKING HOLLOW METAL OBJECTS | [2024/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION D'OBJETS MÉTALLIQUES CREUX | [2024/18] |
Former [2016/15] | HOHLE METALLOBJEKTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2016/15] | HOLLOW METAL OBJECTS AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME | ||
Former [2016/15] | OBJETS MÉTALLIQUES CREUX ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4447466 (JACKSON MELVIN R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * figures 1-4; examples IV,V ** column 11, line 40 - line 49 *; | [XI]EP1903127 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,9,10,12,15,19 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 14] , [0 17]; figures 1-4 * [I] 11; | [X]EP1995411 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 12-20 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058] * |