EP2944014 - POWER DELIVERY INCLUDING OUT-OF-BAND COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REA, Adam D. 3902 149th Street SW Lynnwood, Washington 98087 / US | 02 /
GREEN, Evan R. 3062 NW Telshire Terrace Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | 03 /
PAXMAN, Robert 2111 NE 25th Avenue Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US | 04 /
GALLAHAN, Ronald W. 4200 NW Carlton Court Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | Hufton, David Alan HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14738163.6 | 09.01.2014 | [2015/47] | WO2014US10780 | Priority number, date | US201313738738 | 10.01.2013 Original published format: US201313738738 | [2015/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014110201 | Date: | 17.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2944014 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/02, H02J50/10, H02J50/80, H02J5/00 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J5/005 (CN);
H02J50/20 (EP);
H02J50/80 (EP,US);
H02J7/00034 (EP,US);
H02J50/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/47] | H02J17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNG MIT BANDEXTERNER KOMMUNIKATION | [2015/47] | English: | POWER DELIVERY INCLUDING OUT-OF-BAND COMMUNICATION | [2015/47] | French: | DISTRIBUTION DE PUISSANCE À COMMUNICATION HORS BANDE | [2015/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 17.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011127951 (WALLEY JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0048] , [0057] , [0094] , [0098] , [0102] , [0103] , [ 123] , [ 160]; figures 5-7,11-13, 19 *; | [X]US2011193417 (HIRASAKA HISATO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0088] , [0089] , [0254] - [0262] - [0293] , [0294] , [0342] , [0343]; figures 3,25 * | International search | [Y]US2005107847 (GRUBER ROBIN [DE], et al); | [A]KR20060082543 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]); | [Y]JP2009240099 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]US2009305742 (CABALLERO RUBEN [US], et al); | [Y]US2010044195 (CHIANG YI-TE [TW], et al) |