EP2943999 - ELECTRICAL PRESS-FIT PIN FOR A SEMICONDUCTOR MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vishay General Semiconductor LLC 150 Motor Parkway Hauppauge, NY 11788 / US | [2017/30] |
Former [2015/47] | For all designated states Vishay General Semiconductor LLC 100 Motor Parkway Hauppauge, NY 11788 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTIUZZO, Emilio Cavalier Brunetto 85/7 10077 San Maurizion Canavese (TO) / IT | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | Engel, Christoph Klaus PATENTSCHUTZengel Marktplatz 6 98527 Suhl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | Engel, Christoph Klaus Engel Patentanwaltskanzlei Marktplatz 6 98527 Suhl/Thüringen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14738326.9 | 14.01.2014 | [2015/47] | WO2014US11454 | Priority number, date | US201361752278P | 14.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361752278 P | [2015/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014110563 | Date: | 17.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2943999 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2943999 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/415, H01R12/58 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H01R13/415 (EP,CN,US);
H01R12/585 (EP,US);
H01R43/26 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49147 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/47] | H01R12/51, H01R12/55 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER EINPRESSSTIFT FÜR EIN HALBLEITERMODUL | [2015/47] | English: | ELECTRICAL PRESS-FIT PIN FOR A SEMICONDUCTOR MODULE | [2015/47] | French: | BROCHE ÉLECTRIQUE À AJUSTER PAR PRESSION POUR UN MODULE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2015/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 09.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2014 | AL | 29.11.2017 | CY | 29.11.2017 | EE | 29.11.2017 | FI | 29.11.2017 | HR | 29.11.2017 | LT | 29.11.2017 | LV | 29.11.2017 | MC | 29.11.2017 | MK | 29.11.2017 | PT | 29.11.2017 | RO | 29.11.2017 | RS | 29.11.2017 | SE | 29.11.2017 | SI | 29.11.2017 | SM | 29.11.2017 | TR | 29.11.2017 | IE | 14.01.2018 | LU | 14.01.2018 | MT | 14.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | BG | 28.02.2018 | NO | 28.02.2018 | GR | 01.03.2018 | IS | 29.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 14.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
MT | 14.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 14.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
MT | 14.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
MT | 14.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
MT | 14.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
MT | 14.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 29.11.2017 | |
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 29.11.2017 | |
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2012295490 (SCHNEIDER RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-3,9-11 * abstract * [Y] 4-8,12-15; | [Y]GB1049435 (AMP INC) [Y] 4-8,12-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2009197439 (NABILEK JANOS [HU], et al); | [Y]US2012295490 (SCHNEIDER RICHARD [US]); | [A]US6997727 (LEGRADY JANOS [US], et al); | [A]US6719573 (KOEHLER DAVID F [US], et al); | [A]JPH11233216 (NIPPON DENKI FACTORY ENGINEERI, et al) | Examination | JP2001148271 | by applicant | US2009197439 | US2012295490 | GB1049435 |