EP3019344 - AIR TYRE HAVING A SOFTENED CARCASS REINFORCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2018/44] |
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
Former [2016/20] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOUCHER, Benoît Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin DGD/PI -F35 - Ladoux F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Le Cam, Stéphane Georges Elie, et al Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2019/43] |
Former [2016/20] | Le Cam, Stéphane Georges Elie Manufacture Francaise des Pneumatiques Michelin 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14739123.9 | 09.07.2014 | [2016/20] | WO2014EP64755 | Priority number, date | FR20130056857 | 12.07.2013 Original published format: FR 1356857 | [2016/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015004205 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3019344 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3019344 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/22, B60C9/20 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
B60C9/2006 (EP,US);
B60C9/22 (US);
B60C11/00 (US);
B60C13/00 (US);
B60C15/00 (US);
B60C9/0007 (EP,US);
B60C9/005 (US);
B60C9/02 (US);
B60C9/20 (US);
B60C2009/0078 (US);
B60C2009/0425 (EP,US);
B60C2009/2012 (US);
B60C2009/2016 (US);
B60C2009/2019 (US);
B60C2009/2022 (US);
B60C2009/2214 (US);
B60C2009/2219 (EP,US);
B60C2009/2261 (US);
B60C2200/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN MIT EINER ERWEICHTEN KARKASSENVERSTÄRKUNG | [2016/20] | English: | AIR TYRE HAVING A SOFTENED CARCASS REINFORCEMENT | [2016/20] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE COMPORTANT UNE ARMATURE DE CARCASSE ASSOUPLIE | [2016/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 03.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2014 | AL | 23.10.2019 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | NL | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | GB | 09.07.2020 | IE | 09.07.2020 | LU | 09.07.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.07.2014 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
GB | 09.07.2020 | ||
IE | 09.07.2020 | ||
LU | 09.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
GB | 09.07.2020 | ||
IE | 09.07.2020 | ||
LU | 09.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
GB | 09.07.2020 | ||
LU | 09.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
LU | 09.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 23.10.2019 | |
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 23.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4305446 (BROWN JR JACK E, et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 3, lines 28-49; figure 2 * * column 4, lines 45-61 *; | [YD]WO2007003548 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [YD] 1-8 * paragraphs [0057] , [0096]; figures 1,3-5; claims 1,15,21,23 *; | [Y]WO2007003558 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [Y] 1-8* paragraphs [0088] , [0 96] - [0101]; figures 2,4,5 *; | [Y]FR2950838 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0124] - [0127]; figure 4; claim - * | Examination | EP1126074 | WO2006013077 |