EP3025429 - PICKING-UP SIGNALS IN ELECTRICALLY CONTACTLESS MANNERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/34] |
Former [2016/22] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAFFENSCHMIDT, Eberhard c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ACKERMANN, Bernd c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN DEN BIGGELAAR, Theodorus, Johannes, Petrus c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/33] |
Former [2016/22] | 01 /
WAFFENSCHMIDT, Eberhard c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
ACKERMANN, Bernd c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
VAN DEN BIGGELAAR, Theodorus, Johannes, Petrus c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Philips Lighting B.V. Philips Lighting Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 14739174.2 | 16.07.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014EP65199 | Priority number, date | EP20130178201 | 26.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13178201 | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015010975 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3025429 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/54, H04B5/00 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
H04B5/22 (EP,US);
H02J50/05 (US);
H04B3/56 (EP,US);
H04B5/72 (EP,US);
H04B5/79 (EP,US);
H04L12/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Title | German: | STROMKONTAKTLOSE AUFNAHME VON SIGNALEN | [2016/22] | English: | PICKING-UP SIGNALS IN ELECTRICALLY CONTACTLESS MANNERS | [2016/22] | French: | CAPTURE DE SIGNAUX SANS CONTACT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 09.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0092734 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [I] 1,3,4 * page 1, lines 1-5, 19-20; figures 1, 12, 16 * * page 7, lines 9-25 * * page 9, lines 23-35 *; | [A]US4668934 (SHUEY KENNETH C [US]) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5892411 (SCHWAN ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 6, line 35 - line 49 *; | [A]US2008125035 (DELLANTONI NIKOLAUS [AT], et al) [A] 1-5* paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0006] * | Examination | AU2006202255 |