EP3027975 - WARM WATER PREPARER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/23] | WATER HEATER | ||
[2020/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2021/15] |
Former [2016/23] | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRICKE, Bernd Dannenkamp 103 49448 Quernheim / DE | 02 /
MOHMEYER, Nils Richard Wagner Strasse 38 49076 Osnabrück / DE | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2021/15] |
Former [2016/23] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 14739179.1 | 16.07.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014EP65216 | Priority number, date | EP20130178389 | 29.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13178389 | [2016/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015014615 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3027975 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3027975 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/18, F16L59/00, F24H1/20, F17C3/02 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
F24H1/182 (EP);
F16L59/00 (EP);
F17C3/02 (EP);
F24H1/201 (EP);
F24H1/208 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WARMWASSERBEREITER | [2016/23] | English: | WARM WATER PREPARER | [2020/48] | French: | CHAUFFE-EAU | [2016/23] |
Former [2016/23] | WATER HEATER | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 31.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2014 | AL | 14.04.2021 | CY | 14.04.2021 | CZ | 14.04.2021 | DK | 14.04.2021 | EE | 14.04.2021 | ES | 14.04.2021 | FI | 14.04.2021 | HR | 14.04.2021 | LT | 14.04.2021 | LV | 14.04.2021 | MC | 14.04.2021 | MK | 14.04.2021 | NL | 14.04.2021 | RO | 14.04.2021 | RS | 14.04.2021 | SE | 14.04.2021 | SI | 14.04.2021 | SK | 14.04.2021 | SM | 14.04.2021 | BG | 14.07.2021 | NO | 14.07.2021 | GR | 15.07.2021 | IE | 16.07.2021 | LU | 16.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | IS | 14.08.2021 | PT | 16.08.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 16.07.2014 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IE | 16.07.2021 | ||
LU | 16.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 16.07.2014 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IE | 16.07.2021 | ||
LU | 16.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IE | 16.07.2021 | ||
LU | 16.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
LU | 16.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
LU | 16.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
LU | 16.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
LU | 16.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | ES | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | ES | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
LT | 14.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]CH183406 (SCHUMACHER ERNST [CH]) [Y] 7 * column 1, paragraph 4 - column 3, line 1; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2576603 (HINES JUDSON T, et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * the whole document * [Y] 13-25; | [IY]US4286573 (NICKEL HERBERT W) [I] 13,24,25 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 41; figure 1 *[Y] 8-11,14-16,19-21; | [Y]US4409962 (RILEY HARRY J [AU]) [Y] 4,5 * column 2, line 1 - column 2, line 19; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XY]US5923819 (ROSS DAVID O [US], et al) [X] 13,14,16,18,24 * column 3, line 23 - column 3, line 47; figure 1 * [Y] 8-11; | [XY]GB2352023 (BAXI PARTNERSHIP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6,12 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 8 - page 5, paragraph 3; figure 1 * [Y] 4,5,7-11; | [XI]EP1840484 (BRADFORD WHITE CORP [US]) [X] 1,6-8,13,14,16,24,25 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 1,2,9 * [I] 9-11,15,20,21,23; | [XY]EP2495500 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0040]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 8-11,13-25 | Examination | DE4336190 |