EP2946400 - SURFACE PRETREATMENT AND DROP SPREADING CONTROL ON MULTI COMPONENT SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Camtek Ltd Ramat Gabriel Industrial Park P.O.B 544 23150 Migdal-Haemek / IL | [2015/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NITZAN, Boaz 21 HaBrosh Street 4493500 Sde Warburg / IL | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2015/48] | Application number, filing date | 14740366.1 | 21.01.2014 | [2015/48] | WO2014IL50066 | Priority number, date | US201361754718P | 21.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361754718 P | [2015/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014111942 | Date: | 24.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2946400 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 24.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/02, H01L21/308, H05K3/00, B41J11/62, B41M5/00, B41J11/00, H01L21/306, H05K3/34, // H05K3/38 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
B41M5/0011 (EP,CN,US);
H05K1/056 (US);
B41J11/0015 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/306 (EP,CN,US);
H05K3/3452 (EP,CN,US);
H05K2203/013 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/48] | H01L21/02, H01L21/308, H05K3/00, B41J11/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENVORBEHANDLUNG UND TROPFENVERTEILUNGSSTEUERUNG AUF OBERFLÄCHEN MIT MEHREREN KOMPONENTEN | [2015/48] | English: | SURFACE PRETREATMENT AND DROP SPREADING CONTROL ON MULTI COMPONENT SURFACES | [2015/48] | French: | PRÉTRAITEMENT DE SURFACE ET COMMANDE DE DIFFUSION DE GOUTTES SUR DES SURFACES À COMPOSANTS MULTIPLES | [2015/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 06.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/52] | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003003231 (KIGUCHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,13,14 * claims 1,20 * * paragraphs [0076] , [0098] , [0099] , [0100] *; | [A]US2003113229 (BRIONES NATALIA [US], et al) [A] 10-12 * claims 1,4,6,7 ** paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]US2006046069 (JUNG GUN Y [US], et al) [Y] 10-12 * claims 1,8,11 * * paragraphs [0022] , [0031] , [0032] , [0041] , [0042] , [0044] , [0046] * * figure 3 *; | [XYI]US2010230696 (FUKUNAGA TAKAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,13,14 * claims 1,2,4,6 * * paragraphs [0136] , [0144] , [0181] , [0198] , [0254] , [0256] , [0260] , [0261] , [0272] * * figures 15A-16B * [Y] 10-12 [I] 7,8 | International search | [A]US2003232128 (FURUSAWA MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US2006159838 (KOWALSKI MARK H [US], et al); | [A]US2012217165 (FENG HSIEN-PING [US], et al); | [X]US2012314007 (SHIMOFUKU AKIRA [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2003003231 | US2010230696 |