EP2947299 - ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yanmar Power Technology Co., Ltd. Chayamachi 1-32 Kita Ward Osaka City / JP | [2020/38] |
Former [2015/48] | For all designated states Yanmar Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8311 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAI, Gou c/o YANMAR CO. LTD. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8311 / JP | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | Poindron, Cyrille, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2022/35] |
Former [2015/48] | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14740928.8 | 14.01.2014 | [2015/48] | WO2014JP50479 | Priority number, date | JP20130004699 | 15.01.2013 Original published format: JP 2013004699 | [2015/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014112489 | Date: | 24.07.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2947299 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2947299 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02D19/06, F02M26/36, F02M26/34, F02M35/108, // F02B1/12, F02B29/04, F02M26/28, F02M31/20 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
F02M26/19 (EP,US);
F02B1/12 (EP,US);
F02B33/22 (EP,US);
F02B37/04 (EP,US);
F02B51/00 (EP,US);
F02B7/00 (EP,US);
F02B73/00 (EP);
F02D19/0671 (EP,US);
F02D25/00 (EP);
F02D41/0025 (EP,US);
F02M26/05 (EP,US);
F02M26/08 (EP,US);
F02M26/34 (EP,US);
F02M26/36 (EP,US);
F02B29/0406 (EP,US);
F02M26/28 (EP,US);
F02M31/08 (EP,US);
F02M31/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/30 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/48] | F02D19/08, F02D21/08, F02D41/02, F02M25/00, F02M25/07, F02M31/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTOR | [2015/48] | English: | ENGINE | [2015/48] | French: | MOTEUR | [2015/48] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2015 | Translation filed | 17.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 27.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2022 | AT | 31.08.2022 | CZ | 31.08.2022 | DK | 31.08.2022 | EE | 31.08.2022 | ES | 31.08.2022 | FI | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | IT | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | NL | 31.08.2022 | PL | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SE | 31.08.2022 | SI | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | NO | 30.11.2022 | GR | 01.12.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | IE | 14.01.2023 | LU | 14.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | FR | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
IT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
IE | 14.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
FR | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
IE | 14.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
FR | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
FR | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 31.08.2022 | |
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2004144337 (WAKAO KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0138] - [0146] *[A] 2-5; | [YA]JP2006037879 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 2 * abstract * [A] 1,3-5; | [XYI]US2006112940 (ROBERTS CHARLES E JR [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0013] , [0025] * [Y] 2 [I] 4; | [XAI]WO2011145203 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 5 [I] 4; | [P]US2013061575 (KORENAGA SHINGO [JP], et al) [P] * abstract * * paragraphs [0100] , [0156] - [0167] * | International search | [A]JPH0988729 (NIPPON SOKEN); | [X]JP2004251273 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2006037879 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2007278194 (HINO MOTORS LTD) | by applicant | JP2005105945 |