EP3030137 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTING PHYSIOLOGICAL INFORMATION FROM REMOTELY DETECTED ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE HAAN, Gerard c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/37] |
Former [2016/24] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 14742533.4 | 25.07.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014EP65997 | Priority number, date | US201361862565P | 06.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361862565 P | EP20130179563 | 07.08.2013 Original published format: EP 13179563 | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015018657 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3030137 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3030137 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/1455, A61B5/24 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/14552 (US);
A61B5/14546 (US);
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B5/24 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | A61B5/00, A61B5/1455, A61B5/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM EXTRAHIEREN VON PHYSIOLOGISCHEN INFORMATIONEN AUS ENTFERNT ENTDECKTER ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER STRAHLUNG | [2016/24] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTING PHYSIOLOGICAL INFORMATION FROM REMOTELY DETECTED ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION | [2016/24] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'EXTRAIRE DES INFORMATIONS PHYSIOLOGIQUES À PARTIR DU RAYONNEMENT ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE DÉTECTÉ À DISTANCE | [2023/17] |
Former [2016/24] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION D'INFORMATIONS PHYSIOLOGIQUES À PARTIR D'UN RAYONNEMENT ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE DÉTECTÉ À DISTANCE | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.05.2023 | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19741982 (BLAZEK VLADIMIR PROF DR ING [DE]) [Y] 5 * column 5, lines 30-50; figures 1-4; claims 1-14 ** column 3, lines 15-35 *; | [Y]US2011157340 (YAMAZAKI KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1-4; claims 1-17 *; | [Y]US2012195486 (KIRENKO IHOR OLEHOVYCH [NL], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 71] - [0083] - [0 87] - [0011] - [ 1370]; figures 1-6; claims 1-15 *; | [Y]US2012197137 (JEANNE VINCENT [NL], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0035] - [0071]; figures 1-6 *; | [YD]US2013057865 (MEIJER EDUARD JOHANNES [NL], et al) [YD] 5,6,11 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0 18] - [0024]; figures 1-3; claims 1-22 *; | [Y]WO2013038326 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 6 - page 24, line 5; figures 1-10; claims 1-14 *; | [Y] - WIM VERKRUYSSE ET AL, "Remote plethysmographic imaging using ambient light", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20081222), vol. 16, no. 26, doi:10.1364/OE.16.021434, ISSN 1094-4087, page 21434, XP055065281 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.16.021434 | Examination | US6847835 | US2009137908 | WO2013030745 | EP2928360 | by applicant | DE19741982 | US2011157340 | WO2011148280 | US2012195486 | US2012197137 | WO2013038326 | - VERKRUYSSE ET AL., "Remote plethysmographic imaging using ambient light", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20081222), vol. 16, no. 26, doi:doi:10.1364/OE.16.021434, pages 21434 - 21445, XP002735416 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.16.021434 |