EP3020244 - CONTENTION CONTROL MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2016/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENTINK, Maarten, Menzo 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2016/20] | Application number, filing date | 14742688.6 | 03.07.2014 | [2016/20] | WO2014US45379 | Priority number, date | US201361844261P | 09.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361844261 P | US201361844834P | 10.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361844834 P | US201414292006 | 30.05.2014 Original published format: US201414292006 | [2016/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015006158 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3020244 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
H04W74/085 (EP,US);
H04W74/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] | Title | German: | KONFLIKTSTEUERUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2016/20] | English: | CONTENTION CONTROL MECHANISM | [2016/20] | French: | MÉCANISME DE LIMITATION DES COLLISIONS | [2016/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 02.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008025342 (KIM EUN-KYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 3-5 *; | [X]WO2011053775 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0080] *; | [A]US2012051342 (LIU YONG [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A] - SIWARUK SIWAMOGSATHAM ED - ANONYMOUS, A novel smart-DCF scheme for high-speed WLANs, COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, 2007. ISCIT '07. INT ERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, PAGE(S) 1032 - 1037, (20071001), ISBN 978-1-4244-0976-1, XP031166613 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCIT.2007.4392168 | [A] - SIWAMOGSATHAM S ED - ANONYMOUS, On Backoff Timer Scheduling for Smart-DCF and Performance Evaluation, 22ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ADVANCED INFORMATION NETWORKING AND APPLICATIONS - WORKSHOPS, 2008 : AINA 2008, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, PAGE(S) 1278 - 1284, (20080325), ISBN 978-0-7695-3096-3, XP031240991 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * |