EP2948441 - METHOD FOR PREPARING 1-(4-(4-(3,4-DICHLORO-2-FLUOROPHENYLAMINO)-7-METHOXYQUINAZOLIN-6-YLOXY)PIPERIDIN-1-YL)PROP-2-EN-1-ONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanmi Pharm. Co., Ltd. 214 Muha-ro Paltan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-910 / KR | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANG, Keuk Chan 4304-501 2 Gwanggyomaeul-ro Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-130 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Jae Hyuk 302-ho 65 Guksabong 10-gil Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-846 / KR | 03 /
MOON, Young Ho 146-1203 498 Yeongtong-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-740 / KR | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [2017/52] |
Former [2015/49] | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Albright IP Limited Eagle Tower Montpellier Drive Cheltenham GL50 1TA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14743689.3 | 27.01.2014 | [2015/49] | WO2014KR00752 | Priority number, date | KR20130009282 | 28.01.2013 Original published format: KR 20130009282 | [2015/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014116070 | Date: | 31.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2948441 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2948441 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, A61K31/517, A61P35/00 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/517 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,RU);
C07D211/46 (EP,IL,US);
C07D239/86 (EP,IL,US);
C07D239/94 (EP,IL,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1-(4-(4-(3,4-DICHLOR-2-FLUORPHENYLAMINO) -7-METHOXYCHINAZOLIN-6-YLOXY)PIPERIDIN-1-YL)PROP-2-EN-1-ON | [2017/17] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING 1-(4-(4-(3,4-DICHLORO-2-FLUOROPHENYLAMINO)-7-METHOXYQUINAZOLIN-6-YLOXY)PIPERIDIN-1-YL)PROP-2-EN-1-ONE | [2015/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE 1-(4-(4-(3,4-DICHLORO-2-FLUOROPHÉNYLAMINO)- 7-MÉTHOXYQUINAZOLIN-6-YLOXY)PIPÉRIDIN-1-YL)PROP-2-ÉN-1-ONE | [2015/49] |
Former [2015/49] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1- (4- (4- (3,4-DICHLOR-2-FLUORPHENYLAMINO) -7-METHOXYCHINAZOLIN-6-YLOXY) PIPERIDIN-1-YL) PROP-2-EN-1-ON | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 30.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2014 | AL | 27.12.2017 | CY | 27.12.2017 | CZ | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | HR | 27.12.2017 | LT | 27.12.2017 | LV | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | MK | 27.12.2017 | PL | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | RO | 27.12.2017 | RS | 27.12.2017 | SI | 27.12.2017 | SK | 27.12.2017 | SM | 27.12.2017 | LU | 27.01.2018 | MT | 27.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | BG | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | IS | 27.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.01.2014 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MK | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
MT | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 27.01.2014 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
MT | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
MT | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
MT | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005033096 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al); | [A]WO2007118854 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al); | [ID]WO2008150118 (HANMI PHARM IND CO LTD [KR], et al); | [AP]WO2013051883 (HANMI SCIENCE CO LTD [KR]); | International search | [A]WO2008150118 (HANMI PHARM IND CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]WO2011155793 (HANMI HOLDINGS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]WO2012169733 (HANMI PHARM IND CO LTD [KR], et al); |