EP3027558 - METHOD FOR MAKING AN AEROGEL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/23] | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN AEROGEL MATERIAL | ||
[2020/44] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMPA Eidgenössische Materialprüfungs- und Forschungsanstalt Überlandstrasse 129 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOEBEL, Matthias Schüracherstrasse 41b CH-8306 Brüttisellen / CH | 02 /
ZHAO, Shanyu Im Grund 12 CH-8600 Dübendorf / CH | 03 /
BRUNNER, Samuel Mutschellenstrasse 77 CH-8038 Zürich / CH | 04 /
SIMMEN, Caroline Im Leemann 8 CH-8805 Richterswil / CH | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Schmauder & Partner AG Patent- & Markenanwälte VSP Zwängiweg 7 8038 Zürich / CH | [2016/23] | Application number, filing date | 14744131.5 | 28.07.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014EP66213 | Priority number, date | EP20130179185 | 02.08.2013 Original published format: EP 13179185 | [2016/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015014813 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3027558 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/145, C01B33/155, C01B33/158 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
C01B33/145 (EP,US);
E04B1/78 (US);
C01B33/155 (EP,US);
C01B33/1585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AEROGELMATERIALS | [2016/23] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING AN AEROGEL MATERIAL | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DÝUN MATÉRIAU AÉROGEL | [2020/44] |
Former [2016/23] | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN AEROGEL MATERIAL | ||
Former [2016/23] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN MATÉRIAU AÉROGEL | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 19.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/40] | 28.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0585456 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* examples 1-10 *; | [A]US2005192366 (OU DUAN L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0060] * * examples 1-10 * * claims 12-17 *; | [A]FR2873677 (ARMINES ASS POUR LA RECH ET LE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 1 * * claims 1-8 *; | [XDI]WO2013053951 (ENERSENS [FR]) [XD] 14,15 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 5 * * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 2 * * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-11 * [I] 1-13; | [A] - SCHWERTFEGER F ET AL, "Hydrophobic waterglass based aerogels without solvent exchange or supercritical drying", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PHYSICS PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980415), vol. 225, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0022-3093(98)00102-1, ISSN 0022-3093, pages 24 - 29, XP004178503 [A] 1-15 * page 24, column l, paragraph 1 - page 26, column l, paragraph 2 * * figures 1, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-3093(98)00102-1 | Examination | EP2119731 | EP3009480 |