EP3033526 - MICROFLUIDIC DEVICE WITH VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN EEMEREN, Johannes Theodorus Wilhelmus Maria c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DOBBELAER-BOSBOOM, Irene Johanna Monica c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN DER ZAAG, Pieter Jan c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2016/25] | Claveau, Olivier Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 14744557.1 | 29.07.2014 | [2016/25] | WO2014EP66216 | Priority number, date | EP20130180119 | 12.08.2013 Original published format: EP 13180119 | [2016/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015022176 | Date: | 19.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3033526 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3033526 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/04, F16K99/00 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
F04B43/028 (EP,US);
F04B43/06 (EP,US);
F16K99/0007 (EP,US);
F16K99/0015 (US);
F16K99/0055 (US);
F16K99/0057 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT VENTIL | [2016/25] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC DEVICE WITH VALVE | [2016/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF MICROFLUIDIQUE AVEC VALVE | [2020/04] |
Former [2016/25] | DISPOSITIF MICROFLUIDIQUE AVEC SOUPAPE | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 05.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2014 | AL | 17.06.2020 | AT | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | TR | 17.06.2020 | IE | 29.07.2020 | LU | 29.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.07.2014 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MT | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
TR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 29.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 29.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6431212 (HAYENGA JON W [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XYI]US2002155010 (KARP CHRISTOPH D [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10-15 * figures 1C,1D,2C,2D,3C,3D * [Y] 7,8 [I] 6,7,9; | [X]US2004052657 (VAN LINTEL HARALD T [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,11-13,15 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2010243078 (YOO JAE CHERN [KR]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraphs [0024] , [0037] , [0079] *; | [AD]US7942160 (JEON NOO LI [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * |