EP2953014 - DOCUMENT BROWSING DEVICE, METHOD FOR TURNING OVER PAGES OF ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2019/09] |
Former [2015/50] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINEHARA, Hidetoshi c/o NEC Mobile Communications Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | [2019/09] |
Former [2016/06] | 01 /
KINEHARA, Hidetoshi c/o NEC Mobile Communications Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | ||
Former [2015/50] | 01 /
KINEHARA, Hidetoshi c/o NEC Mobile Communications Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 2118666 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/50] | Application number, filing date | 14745967.1 | 31.01.2014 | [2015/50] | WO2014JP52229 | Priority number, date | JP20130016849 | 31.01.2013 Original published format: JP 2013016849 | [2015/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014119716 | Date: | 07.08.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2953014 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2953014 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0346, G06F15/02, G06F3/0488, G06F3/0483, G06F3/0484 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/0483 (EP,US);
G06F15/0291 (EP,US);
G06F3/0346 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (US);
G06F3/04845 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/35] | G06F3/048, G06F3/041, G06F3/0488, G06F3/0483, G06F3/0484 | ||
Former IPC [2015/50] | G06F3/048, G06F3/041, G06F3/0488 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOKUMENTENDURCHSUCHUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUM UMDREHEN VON SEITEN ELEKTRONISCHER DOKUMENTE UND PROGRAMM | [2015/50] | English: | DOCUMENT BROWSING DEVICE, METHOD FOR TURNING OVER PAGES OF ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT, AND PROGRAM | [2015/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FEUILLETAGE DE DOCUMENTS, PROCÉDÉ POUR TOURNER LES PAGES D'UN DOCUMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE, ET PROGRAMME ASSOCIÉ | [2015/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2015 | Translation filed | 17.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 24.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2014 | AL | 27.02.2019 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | ES | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | IT | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | NL | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.01.2014 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001125700 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]US2004183776 (HO SENG BENG [SG]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0200] - paragraph [0203] *; | [A]WO2011143720 (RPO PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 16 - page 4, line 26 * * page 7, line 18 - page 9, line 29 *; | [A]EP2437152 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0098] *; | [A]US2012102424 (CHONG KIN FUI [SG], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] *; | [I]US2012176385 (GUNJI DAISUKE [JP], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0115] *; | [A]US2012182310 (OKADA MIKIYA [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0103] * | International search | [Y]JPH07319899 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2011090575 (RICOH CO LTD); | [A]JP2011186904 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2012079301 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]JP2012150566 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | JP2000163444 | JP2011170603 |