EP3027251 - DEVICE FOR INJECTING A HYPODERMIC SYRINGE INTO A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Union Medico ApS Fruebjergvej 3 Symbion 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | [2020/25] |
Former [2016/23] | For all designated states Union Medico ApS Fruebjergvej 3 Symbion 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERTHU, Michael Fruebjergvej 3 2100 Copenhagen / DK | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Kjerrumgaard, Lars Bo Nex & Phister Law & IP ApS Cobis Ole Maaløes Vej 3 2200 København N / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | Kjerrumgaard, Lars Bo Nex & Phister ApS Cobis Ole Maaløes Vej 3 2200 København N / DK | ||
Former [2016/23] | ZBM Patents ApS Symbion Box:33 Fruebjergvej 3 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | Application number, filing date | 14746945.6 | 30.07.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014DK00040 | Priority number, date | DK20130070426 | 02.08.2013 Original published format: DK 201370426 | DK20130070427 | 02.08.2013 Original published format: DK 201370427 | DK20130070428 | 02.08.2013 Original published format: DK 201370428 | DK20130070429 | 02.08.2013 Original published format: DK 201370429 | DK20130070625 | 28.10.2013 Original published format: DK 201370625 | [2016/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015014363 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3027251 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3027251 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32, A61M5/20 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
A61M5/3287 (EP,US);
A61M5/3204 (US);
A61M5/3202 (US);
A61M2005/202 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2073 (EP,US);
A61M2005/208 (EP,US);
A61M2205/13 (US);
A61M2205/43 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERABREICHUNG EINER SUBKUTANEN INJEKTION AN EINEN PATIENTEN | [2016/23] | English: | DEVICE FOR INJECTING A HYPODERMIC SYRINGE INTO A PATIENT | [2016/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR INJECTION D'UNE SERINGUE HYPODERMIQUE DANS UN PATIENT | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 26.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2014 | AL | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MT | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US1320536 (DI FALCO R.; DE PAUL J.) [X] 1-4,6-9,13,14 * the whole document * [I] 5,10-12,15-18; | [I]US1991103 (KING GEORGE L) [I] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US2664086 (TRANSUE GERALD O) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [I]US2918063 (TUCKER SHIRLEY S) [I] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [I]AU8704582 (FRANCO R, et al) [I] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US4787891 (LEVIN PAUL D [US], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document * |