EP3017181 - AIR INTAKE HEATER SYSTEM AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hidria AET Poljubinj 89A 5220 Tolmin / SI | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URSIC, Peter Mlinsko 7A 5222 Kobarid / SI | 02 /
URBAS, Janez Gregorciceva ulica 4 Tolmin, 5220 / SI | 03 /
KRAVOS, Dean Glavni trg 16A 5271 Vipava / SI | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2016/19] | Application number, filing date | 14747309.4 | 03.07.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014EP64193 | Priority number, date | US201361842488P | 03.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361842488 P | US201361904306P | 14.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361904306 P | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015001023 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3017181 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/10, F02M31/13 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
F02M31/042 (EP,US);
F02M31/13 (EP,US);
F02M35/10268 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Title | German: | LUFTEINLASSHEIZSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2016/19] | English: | AIR INTAKE HEATER SYSTEM AND METHODS | [2016/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉCHAUFFEUR D'ENTRÉE D'AIR ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2016/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 29.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPS59134391U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,12-17,20-24 * figures 2,3,4,5 *[I] 9,26; | [XI]JP2003201930 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO) [X] 1-8,10-25 * figures 1-8,13,14 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0024] * [I] 26; | [XI]KR20090022080 (WOO JIN IND CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,7-10,17,20-24 * figures 3-6 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0017] * [I] 26 | Examination | JPS59160849 | EP2525073 |