EP3039720 - BIPOLAR NON-PUNCH-THROUGH POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2017/20] |
Former [2016/27] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTAN, Virgiliu Seetalweg 11 CH-5702 Niederlenz / CH | 02 /
VOBECKY, Jan Rathausgasse 35 CH-5600 Lenzburg / CH | 03 /
STIEGLER, Karlheinz Alter Zürichweg 3 CH-5702 Niederlenz / CH | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP) Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2016/27] | Application number, filing date | 14747388.8 | 05.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014EP66796 | Priority number, date | EP20130182052 | 28.08.2013 Original published format: EP 13182052 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015028263 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3039720 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3039720 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/74, H01L29/10, H01L29/08, H01L29/06, H01L21/332 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
H01L29/66363 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/74 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/744 (US);
H01L29/0638 (US);
H01L29/0657 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/0661 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/0834 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/0839 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/102 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/1095 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIPOLARES NON-PUNCH-THROUGH-LEISTUNGSHALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2017/19] | English: | BIPOLAR NON-PUNCH-THROUGH POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2016/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR BIPOLAIRE DE PUISSANCE SANS PERÇAGE | [2017/19] |
Former [2016/27] | BIPOLARES LEISTUNGSHALBLEITERBAUELEMENT OHNE DURCHGANG | ||
Former [2016/27] | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE PUISSANCE BIPOLAIRE DE TYPE NON PERFORÉ | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 02.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2014 | AL | 04.10.2017 | AT | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | DK | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | ES | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | IT | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | MK | 04.10.2017 | NL | 04.10.2017 | PL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | RS | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | SM | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | NO | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 05.08.2014 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 05.08.2014 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 04.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0303046 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 1-3,5,7-9,11,13-15,20 * column 4, line 24 - column 6, line 21; figures 1A-1D *; | [AD]WO2012041836 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1,3-7,10-12,14-16,18,19 * page 7, line 15 - page 12, line 4; figure 2 ** page 13, line 10 - page 15, line 5; figures 5-12 * |