EP3042391 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SUBSTRATE, SUBSTRATE, METAL-OXIDE-SEMICONDUCTOR FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR WITH A SUBSTRATE, MICRO-ELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEM WITH A SUBSTRATE, AND MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2016/28] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAUTMANN, Achim Stuttgarter Strasse 12 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
BANZHAF, Christian Tobias Bleichwiese 21 89150 Laichingen / DE | [2016/28] | Application number, filing date | 14747945.5 | 07.08.2014 | [2016/28] | WO2014EP66951 | Priority number, date | DE201310217768 | 05.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013217768 | [2016/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015032577 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3042391 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/308, H01L29/16, H01L29/66, H01L29/78, B81B1/00, B81C1/00, H01L29/423 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
H01L29/7813 (EP,US);
H01L21/3083 (EP,US);
H01L29/045 (US);
H01L29/1095 (US);
H01L29/1608 (EP,US);
H01L29/4236 (EP,US);
H01L29/66068 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/28] | H01L21/308, H01L29/16, H01L29/66, H01L29/78, B81B1/00, B81C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SUBSTRATS, SUBSTRAT, METALL-OXID-HALBLEITER-FELDEFFEKTTRANSISTOR MIT EINEM SUBSTRAT, MIKROELEKTROMECHANISCHES SYSTEM MIT EINEM SUBSTRAT, UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2016/28] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SUBSTRATE, SUBSTRATE, METAL-OXIDE-SEMICONDUCTOR FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR WITH A SUBSTRATE, MICRO-ELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEM WITH A SUBSTRATE, AND MOTOR VEHICLE | [2016/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UN SUBSTRAT, SUBSTRAT, TRANSISTOR À EFFET DE CHAMP MÉTAL-OXYDE-SEMI-CONDUCTEUR POURVU D'UN SUBSTRAT, SYSTÈME MICROÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE POURVU D'UN SUBSTRAT, ET VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2016/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 09.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009272982 (NAKAMURA SHUN-ICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * paragraphs [0058] - [0063] - [0066] , [0181] - [0184]; figures 48,49 * * paragraph [0135]; figures 37,67 * [I] 3,10; | [X]EP2258655 (ACREO AB [SE]) [X] 9 * paragraphs [0027] - [0033]; figure 6 *; | [XP]WO2014010006 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1,2,6-8 * paragraphs [0055] - [0058]; figures 25-30 * | [I] - LAURA J. EVANS ET AL, "Deep Reactive Ion Etching (DRIE) of High Aspect Ratio SiC Microstructures Using a Time-Multiplexed Etch-Passivate Process", MATERIALS SCIENCE FORUM, (20061015), vol. 527-529, doi:10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.527-529.1115, pages 1115 - 1118, XP055142896 [I] 9 * page 1115 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.527-529.1115 |