EP2953986 - INCIPIENT WETNESS METHOD TO ENHANCE PRODUCTIVITY OF SUPPORTED ZIEGLER-NATTA CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DATTA, Sudhin 315 E. Cowan Drive Houston, TX 77007 / US | 02 /
ZHAO, Mosha, H. 5353 Institute Lane 14 Houston, TX 77005 / US | 03 /
LEGG, Elizabeth, A. 2045 N. Gessner Road 120 Houstonm, TX 77080 / US | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 14749416.5 | 20.01.2014 | [2015/51] | WO2014US12209 | Priority number, date | US201361761370P | 06.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361761370 P | EP20130161994 | 02.04.2013 Original published format: EP 13161994 | [2016/01] |
Former [2015/51] | US201361761370P | 06.02.2013 | |
EP20130161944 | 02.04.2013 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014123684 | Date: | 14.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2953986 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/00, C08L23/12, C08F210/06, // C08F4/654, C08F4/656 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
C08F2/001 (EP,US);
C08J9/0061 (US);
C08F10/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2207/02 (EP,US);
C08L2308/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/06, C08F2/001 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F4/6543 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F4/6565 (EP,US);
C08L23/12, C08F2/001, C08F4/6543 (US);
C08L23/12, C08L23/16 (EP,US);
C08L23/12, C08L23/16, C08L2205/02, C08L2207/02 (US);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/12 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/18, C08F236/20, C08F2500/12 (US,EP) (-) |
Former IPC [2015/51] | C08F210/02, C08F210/06, C08F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Title | German: | EINSETZENDES FEUCHTIGKEITSVERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER PRODUKTIVITÄT VON UNTERSTÜTZTEN ZIEGLER-NATTA-KATALYSATOREN | [2015/51] | English: | INCIPIENT WETNESS METHOD TO ENHANCE PRODUCTIVITY OF SUPPORTED ZIEGLER-NATTA CATALYSTS | [2015/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'HYDRATATION INITIALE PERMETTANT D'AMÉLIORER LA PRODUCTIVITÉ DE CATALYSEURS SUPPORTÉS DE ZIEGLER-NATTA | [2015/51] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 05.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0053646 (MONTELL TECHNOLOGY COMPANY BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US2006293461 (JIANG PEIJUN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4407989 (TAKAO HIROYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2006052541 (HAGEN ERLING [NO], et al); | [A]US2011306731 (CHOU CHAI-JING [US]); | [A]WO2012034956 (BOREALIS AG [AT], et al); | [Y] - URDAMPILLETA, IDOIA ET AL., "Morphology of high impact polypropylene particles.", MACROMOLECULES., (2005), vol. 38, no. 7, pages 2795 - 2801, XP055214743 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma047413v | [A] - DEBLING, JON A. ET AL., "Morphological development of impact polypropylene produced in gas phase with a TiC14/MgC12 catalyst.", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 81, no. 13, pages 3085 - 3106, XP055214748 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1761 |