EP3031230 - IDENTIFYING AND COMMUNICATING COVERAGE SHORTFALL FOR MACHINE TYPE COMMUNICATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATASUK, Rapeepat 4250 Forest Glen Drive Hoffman Estates, Illinois 60192 / US | 02 /
YANG, Weidong 4425 Thornbark Court Hoffman Estates, Illinois 60192 / US | 03 /
TAN, Jun 988 Cormer Drive Lake Zurich, Illinois 60047 / US | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2020/10] |
Former [2016/24] | Borgström, Markus Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG T&I IPR Patent Administration St.-Martin-Straße 76 80240 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14750162.1 | 30.07.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014EP66351 | Priority number, date | US201361864265P | 09.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361864265 P | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015018702 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3031230 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3031230 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04W74/004 (US);
H04L43/0829 (US);
H04L43/16 (US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IDENTIFIKATION UND MELDUNG VERKÜRZTER REICHWEITEN FÜR MASCHINENKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2016/24] | English: | IDENTIFYING AND COMMUNICATING COVERAGE SHORTFALL FOR MACHINE TYPE COMMUNICATION DEVICES | [2016/24] | French: | IDENTIFICATION ET COMMUNICATION D'UN MANQUE DE COUVERTURE POUR DES DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION DE TYPE MACHINE | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 26.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.01.2019 | 16.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2014 | AL | 04.03.2020 | AT | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | DK | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | PL | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | TR | 04.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | IE | 30.07.2020 | LU | 30.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AL | 04.03.2020 | ||
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - ZTE, "Coverage Improvement Analysis of PRACH for TR36.888 and text proposal", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chicago, USA; 20130415 - 20130419, (20130406), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-131054, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_72b/Docs/, (20130406), XP050697022 [X] 1,5,8,9,20,24,27,28,39,43,46,47,58,59 * chapter 1, chapter 2.1, chapter 2.2.1, chapter 2.2.2, chapter 3, chapter 5 * [I] 2-4,6,7,10,11,21-23,25,26,29,30,40-42,44,45,48,49 | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Text proposal for PRACH coverage improvement for MTC", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chicago, USA; 20130415 - 20130419, (20130515), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-131820, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_72b/Docs/, (20130515), XP050697593 [A] 1-11,20-30,39-49,58,59 * chapter 1, chapter 2 * | [XP] - NSN ET AL, "Mechanism for Identifying and Communicating Coverage Shortfall", vol. RAN WG1, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20130819 - 20130823, (20130810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-133482, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74/Docs/, (20130810), XP050716589 [XP] 1-11,20-30,39-49,58,59 * chapter 1, chapter 2 * | [XAI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Considerations on acquiring the amount of coverage improvement for Low-Cost MTC UEs", vol. RAN WG1, no. Fukuoka, Japan; 20130520 - 20130524, (20130511), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-132410, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_73/Docs/, (20130511), XP050698174 [X] 12,31,50 * chapter 2, chapter 3, chapter 9.5.3.1 * [A] 1-11,20-30,39-49,58,59 [I] 13-19,32-38,51-57 | [XAI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Analysis and evaluation on PRACH coverage improvement for Low-Cost MTC UEs", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chicago, USA; 20130415 - 20130419, (20130406), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-130887, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_72b/Docs/, (20130406), XP050696888 [X] 12,31,50 * chapter 1, chapter 2, chapter 4, chapter 9.5.3 * [A] 1-11,20-30,39-49,58,59 [I] 13-19,32-38,51-57 |