EP3016816 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRIC POWER TRAIN OPTIMISING THE LOW SPEED USE PHASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13/15 Quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUIS, Emmanuel 36 Rue Fabre F-91330 Verrieres-le-Buisson / FR | 02 /
CHEROUAT, Hatem 1 Avenue Raymond Aron F-92160 Antony / FR | 03 /
POTHIN, Richard 126 Rue de Coignières F-78760 Jouars Pontchartrain / FR | 04 /
MARSILIA, Marco 60 Boulevard de la République F-92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2016/19] | Application number, filing date | 14750535.8 | 24.06.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014FR51575 | Priority number, date | FR20130056380 | 01.07.2013 Original published format: FR 1356380 | [2016/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015001223 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3016816 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/00, B60L3/04, B60L3/12, B60L15/20 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
B60L3/003 (EP);
B60L15/2063 (EP);
B60L15/2081 (EP);
B60L3/04 (EP);
B60L3/12 (EP);
B60L2210/40 (EP);
B60L2240/423 (EP);
B60L2240/525 (EP);
B60L2250/26 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES ELEKTROANTRIEBS ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER NIEDRIGGESCHWINDIGKEITS-VERWENDUNGSPHASE | [2016/19] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRIC POWER TRAIN OPTIMISING THE LOW SPEED USE PHASE | [2016/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN GROUPE MOTOPROPULSEUR ELECTRIQUE OPTIMISANT LA PHASE D'UTILISATION A FAIBLE VITESSE | [2016/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 20.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/07] | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2013060409 (MATSUSHITA MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0136] * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP2471682 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0093] * * figures 1-17 *; | [X]US2013066501 (OYAMA KAZUTO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0213] - paragraph [0214] * * figures 1-13,38,44 * |