EP3025085 - REINFORCED WRAPPABLE PROTECTIVE TEXTILE SLEEVE AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Powertrain, Inc. 26555 Northwestern Highway Southfield, MI 48033 / US | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEAL, Jimmy, E. 888 Maple Grove Road Mohnton, PA 19540 / US | [2017/42] |
Former [2016/22] | 01 /
TEA, Jimmy, E. 888 Maple Grove Road Mohnton, PA 19540 / US | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2016/22] | Lessard, Jason Donat, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Withworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14750881.6 | 25.07.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014US48115 | Priority number, date | US201361858527P | 25.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361858527 P | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015013571 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3025085 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3025085 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16L57/00, B60R16/02, H02G3/04, H02G15/18 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
F16L57/00 (EP,US);
F16L57/06 (US);
B29C35/02 (US);
B60R16/0215 (EP,US);
H02G3/0481 (EP,US);
B29L2016/00 (US);
B29L2031/003 (US);
H02G15/18 (US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2457 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTE WICKELBARE TEXTILSCHUTZHÜLLE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2016/22] | English: | REINFORCED WRAPPABLE PROTECTIVE TEXTILE SLEEVE AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF | [2016/22] | French: | MANCHON TEXTILE PROTECTEUR ENVELOPPANT RENFORCÉ, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIÉ | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 22.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2014 | AL | 19.07.2017 | AT | 19.07.2017 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | DK | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | ES | 19.07.2017 | FI | 19.07.2017 | HR | 19.07.2017 | LT | 19.07.2017 | LV | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | MK | 19.07.2017 | NL | 19.07.2017 | PL | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | RS | 19.07.2017 | SE | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | SM | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | IE | 25.07.2017 | LU | 25.07.2017 | MT | 25.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | NO | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | IS | 19.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 25.07.2014 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
MT | 25.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.07.2014 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
MT | 25.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 25.07.2014 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
MT | 25.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 25.07.2014 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
MT | 25.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.07.2014 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
MT | 25.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
MT | 25.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 19.07.2017 | |
NO | 19.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03060373 (FEDERAL MOGUL POWERTRAIN INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph l - page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [XYI]US2007166495 (SELLIS TIMOTHY DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,17-22,27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0030]; figures 6-8 * * paragraph [0024]; figure 4 * [Y] 1-28 [I] 5,10-16,20,23-26,28; | [A]WO2008128022 (FEDERAL MOGUL POWERTRAIN INC [US], et al) [A] 5,20 * abstract ** paragraphs [0030] - [0033]; figures 6-13 *; | [A]WO2008131467 (LENZING PLASTICS GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * page 10, lines 25-36 *; | [XYI]US2011275268 (HARRIS DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,17-22,27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0053] - [0055]; figures 7,8,8A * [Y] 1-28 [I] 5,10-16,20,23-26,28 |