EP2983879 - MULTIAXIAL TOOL MACHINE FOR WORKING STONE SLABS AND/OR BLOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/07] | MULTIAXIAL MACHINE TOOL FOR WORKING STONE SLABS AND/OR BLOCKS | ||
[2016/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Donatoni Macchine S.R.L. Via Napoleone, 14 37015 Domegliara (VR) / IT | [2016/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONATONI, Giorgio Via Don Martini 1 I-37010 Cavaion Veronese (VR) / IT | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Maroscia, Antonio Maroscia & Associati Srl Viale Roma, 3 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | Maroscia, Antonio Maroscia & Associati Srl Piazza del Castello, 26 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 14752396.3 | 27.06.2014 | [2016/07] | WO2014IB62678 | Priority number, date | IT2013VI00167 | 28.06.2013 Original published format: IT VI20130167 | [2016/07] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014207723 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2983879 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2983879 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/04, B28D1/00 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
B28D1/043 (EP);
B28D1/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRACHSIGE WERKZEUGMASCHINE ZUM BEARBEITEN VON STEINPLATTEN UND/ODER -BLÖCKEN | [2016/07] | English: | MULTIAXIAL TOOL MACHINE FOR WORKING STONE SLABS AND/OR BLOCKS | [2016/48] | French: | MACHINE-OUTIL MULTI-AXIALE POUR LE TRAVAIL DE DALLES ET/OU BLOCKS DE PIERRES | [2016/48] |
Former [2016/07] | MULTIAXIAL MACHINE TOOL FOR WORKING STONE SLABS AND/OR BLOCKS | ||
Former [2016/07] | MACHINE-OUTIL MULTIAXIALE POUR USINER DES DALLES ET/OU DES BLOCS DE PIERRE | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 14.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2014 | AL | 26.04.2017 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | NL | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | RS | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | LU | 27.06.2017 | MT | 27.06.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 27.06.2014 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 27.06.2017 | ||
MT | 27.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 27.06.2014 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 27.06.2017 | ||
MT | 27.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.06.2014 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 27.06.2017 | ||
MT | 27.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 27.06.2017 | ||
MT | 27.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 27.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 27.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 26.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]ITPD910087 (ALFAMAC) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph l - page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 7 * * figure - *; | [A]US2011303209 (KANG HEE CHANG [KR]) [A] 1 * figures 3-5 *; | [A]EP2253422 (BURKHARDT GMBH MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0017] * * figure - *; | [A]EP2168742 (CEI COMPANHIA DE EQUIPAMENTOS [PT]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0023] * * figures 1,3 * | by applicant | IT1247180 | US2011303209 |