EP3036477 - LIGHT FITTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scolmore International Limited Scolmore Park Landsberg Lichfield Road Industrial Estate Tamworth, Staffordshire B79 5AQ / GB | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HISCOKE, Daniel 28 Palmerston Avenue Peel Heights Wilnecote Tamworth Staffordshire B77 5FE / GB | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Badger, John Raymond J.R. Badger & Co. 6 Simpson Road Wylde Green Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B72 1EP / GB | [2016/26] | Application number, filing date | 14753283.2 | 29.07.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014GB00306 | Priority number, date | GB20130013819 | 01.08.2013 Original published format: GB 201313819 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015015145 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3036477 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/00, F21S8/02, F21V21/30, F21V25/12, F21V15/01, F21V19/02, F21Y115/10 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
F21S8/02 (EP,US);
F21V21/30 (EP);
F21V29/70 (EP);
F21V19/02 (EP);
F21V25/125 (EP);
F21V29/507 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | LEUCHTENFASSUNG | [2016/26] | English: | LIGHT FITTING | [2016/26] | French: | LUMINAIRE | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 08.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2017 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 28.03.2017 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 22.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2010061097 (KROGMAN MARK J [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9,13-17,19,21 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0029] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 7,8,22-24; | [X]US2013050996 (HOLSCHER STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,13,15,19 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1,4,8,9 *; | [X]WO2012028410 (OSRAM AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10,14-17,21 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2009109670 (BOYER JOHN D [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9,11-18,20 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0039] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2002145871 (YODA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 3,6,13,15-17,21 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2008112168 (PICKARD PAUL KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9-13 * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0168] - paragraph [0172] * * figures 1,2,9 *; | [XI]EP1950491 (PIPER LUX S R L [IT]) [X] 1-4,9,13 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * pages 1,4 * [I] 11,12; | [X]WO2010055070 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,13,14 * page 14, line 23 - line 29 * * page 23, line 20 - page 24, line 3 * * figures 4A,4B *; | [X]CN201190976Y (PANJIT CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-4,6,13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2007109796 (JOHNSON ANDREW J [GB]) [Y] 7,8,22-24 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 1-5,20 *; | [A]WO2008037152 (WU LIANGJU [CN]) [A] 7,8,22-24 * abstract * * figures 9-12 *; | [A]US2009262538 (ONO KEISUKE [JP]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document * |