EP3030939 - TIME PROTOCOL BASED TIMING SYSTEM FOR TIME-OF-FLIGHT INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes Holdings LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | [2023/48] |
Former [2022/48] | For all designated states Baker Hughes Holdings LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | ||
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEN, Yichin 8499 Darrow Road Twinsburg, OH 77087-2309 / US | 02 /
CHOU, Fred, Yu-feng 8499 Darrow Rd Twinsburg, OH 77087-2309 / US | 03 /
DELONG, Michael, Barry 8499 Darrow Rd Twinsburg, OH 44087-2309 / US | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group, et al Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/48] | Novagraaf Group, et al Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | ||
Former [2016/24] | Williams, Andrew Richard, et al GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14753370.7 | 30.07.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014US48804 | Priority number, date | US201313960832 | 07.08.2013 Original published format: US201313960832 | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015020847 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3030939 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3030939 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G04F10/00, G04G7/00, H04J3/06, G06F1/12, G06F1/14 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
G06F1/12 (EP,CN,US);
G04F10/00 (EP,CN,US);
G04G7/00 (EP,CN,US);
G06F1/14 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/22 (US);
H04J3/065 (US);
H04J3/0661 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | G04F10/00, G04G7/00, H04J3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEITPROTOKOLLBASIERTES ZEITSYSTEM FÜR TOF-INSTRUMENTE | [2016/24] | English: | TIME PROTOCOL BASED TIMING SYSTEM FOR TIME-OF-FLIGHT INSTRUMENTS | [2016/24] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TEMPORISATION FONDÉ SUR PROTOCOLE TEMPOREL POUR DES INSTRUMENTS DE TEMPS DE VOL | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0840185 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA [FR]) [X] 1 * column 4, lines 16-33; figures 1,2 ** column 6, lines 10-16, 44-55 *; | [XI]FR2937817 (UNIV CLAUDE BERNARD LYON [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,10,11,14,17,20 * page 8, lines 24-25; figures 1,2 * * page 9, lines 3-11 * * page 11, lines 11-13 * * page 14, lines 33-40 * [I] 3,9,12,13,19; | [XI] - PATRICK LOSCHMIDT ET AL, "White rabbit - sensor/actuator protocol for the CERN LHC particle accelerator", SENSORS, 2009 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091025), ISBN 978-1-4244-4548-6, pages 781 - 786, XP031618937 [X] 1-8,10-12,14-18,20 * pages 781-783; figures 1,2 * [I] 9,13,19 | Examination | US2012153166 |