EP2911308 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SIGNAL INTERFERENCE PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Long Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LIN, Huajiong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LV, Linjun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
HAN, Bo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2019/21] |
Former [2015/35] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Strasse 12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 14753619.7 | 22.02.2014 | [2015/35] | WO2014CN72419 | Priority number, date | CN20131056462 | 22.02.2013 Original published format: CN201310056462 | [2015/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014127742 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2911308 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2911308 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/7097, H04B1/10, H04B1/525, H04B1/12, H04B17/345, H04L5/00, H04L5/14 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
H04B1/525 (EP,US);
H04B1/1027 (CN,US);
H04B1/126 (US);
H04B1/123 (EP,US);
H04B17/345 (US);
H04L27/3455 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2015/49] | H04B1/7097, H04B1/10, H04B1/525 | ||
Former IPC [2015/35] | H04B1/7097 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SIGNALINTERFERENZVERARBEITUNG | [2015/35] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SIGNAL INTERFERENCE PROCESSING | [2015/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DU BROUILLAGE D'UN SIGNAL | [2015/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2015 | Translation filed | 18.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 04.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2014 | AL | 22.05.2019 | AT | 22.05.2019 | CY | 22.05.2019 | CZ | 22.05.2019 | DK | 22.05.2019 | EE | 22.05.2019 | ES | 22.05.2019 | FI | 22.05.2019 | HR | 22.05.2019 | LT | 22.05.2019 | LV | 22.05.2019 | MC | 22.05.2019 | MK | 22.05.2019 | MT | 22.05.2019 | NL | 22.05.2019 | PL | 22.05.2019 | RO | 22.05.2019 | RS | 22.05.2019 | SE | 22.05.2019 | SI | 22.05.2019 | SK | 22.05.2019 | SM | 22.05.2019 | TR | 22.05.2019 | BG | 22.08.2019 | NO | 22.08.2019 | GR | 23.08.2019 | IS | 22.09.2019 | PT | 22.09.2019 | IE | 22.02.2020 | LU | 22.02.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 22.02.2014 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 22.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.02.2014 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 22.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 22.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008198772 (LOH LUP MENG [US]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]EP2148480 (MULTI MODE MULTI MEDIA SOLUTIO [BE]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract ** paragraph [0038] * | International search | [A]CN102184431 (INVENGO INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-8 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102769487 (UNIV BEIJING) [A] 1-8* , the whole document * | [A] - JAIN, M. et al., "Practical, Real-time, Full Duplex Wireless", The 17th Annual International Conference on Mobile Computing and Networking (MobiCom' 11), Las Vegas, Nevada, USA, (20110923) [A] 1-8 * , the whole document * |