EP2811556 - MANGANESE DIOXIDE, AND ALKALINE DRY CELL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UZUKA, Shunsuke c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Kenji c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/50] | Application number, filing date | 14754072.8 | 14.01.2014 | WO2014JP00119 | Priority number, date | JP20130029607 | 19.02.2013 Original published format: JP 2013029607 | [2014/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014129104 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2811556 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/50, C01G45/02, C25B1/21, H01M4/06, H01M6/08 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
H01M4/50 (EP,US);
C01G45/02 (EP,US);
H01M6/06 (EP,US);
C01P2002/82 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C25B1/21 (EP,US);
H01M2004/023 (EP,US);
H01M4/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Title | German: | MANGANDIOXID UND ALKALI-TROCKENBATTERIE DAMIT | [2014/50] | English: | MANGANESE DIOXIDE, AND ALKALINE DRY CELL USING SAME | [2014/50] | French: | DIOXYDE DE MANGANÈSE ET PILE ALCALINE SÈCHE L'UTILISANT | [2014/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2014 | Translation filed | 02.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 26.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002046955 (TAKAHASHI KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * page 1, paragraph 0010 * * page 4, paragraphs 0042-0049; examples 1-2 * * table 1 * [I] 4; | [XI]US2012141361 (SUETSUGU KAZUMASA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * pages 1-2, paragraph 0021 * * page 4, paragraph 0060 - paragraph 0063 * [I] 4; | [A]WO2012111766 (TOSOH CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figure 4 *; | [AP]EP2677066 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [AP] 1-5 * figure 4 ** page 7, paragraph 0053 * | International search | [X]JPH02145434 (CHUO DENKI KOGYO CO); | [A]JP2002289186 (TOSOH CORP); | [Y]JP2002348693 (TOSOH CORP); | [A]JP2008066100 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JP2010251221 (TOSOH CORP) | by applicant | JP2004186127 |