EP2913634 - NAVIGATION SYSTEM, NAVIGATION SYSTEM CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.04.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin Aw Co., Ltd. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZAKI, Naokazu c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 14754418.3 | 27.01.2014 | [2015/36] | WO2014JP51636 | Priority number, date | JP20130032971 | 22.02.2013 Original published format: JP 2013032971 | JP20130032977 | 22.02.2013 Original published format: JP 2013032977 | [2015/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014129267 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2913634 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/30, G01S19/46, G01S5/02 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
G01C21/30 (EP,CN,US);
G01C21/26 (US);
G01S19/24 (US);
G01S19/46 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/36] | G01C21/30, G01S5/02, G01S19/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Title | German: | NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM, NAVIGATIONSSYSTEMSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2015/36] | English: | NAVIGATION SYSTEM, NAVIGATION SYSTEM CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM | [2015/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2015 | Translation filed | 29.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.06.2018 | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/35] | 21.04.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 26.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0605926 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 3 * * column 4, lines 8-29 *; | [YD]JPH10141968 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [YD] 1-8,14,15 * abstract * * figures 1,6-8 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0032] *; | [XI]US5936572 (LOOMIS PETER VAN WYCK [US], et al) [X] 1-3,14,15 * figures 6, 9 * * column 5, lines 14-22 * * column 11, line 49 - column 13, line 4 * * column 19, line 32 - column 20, line 28 * * column 7, lines 9-22 * * column 12, lines 53-58 * * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 8 * [I] 9,10; | [XDY]JP2006333180 (KENWOOD CORP) [XD] 9 * paragraphs [0047] - [0051] - [0055] - [0057] - [0076] - [0078] *[Y] 1,9-15 | International search | [X]JPH08335856 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH1038994 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JPH10311731 (JAPAN RADIO CO LTD); | [A]JP2004156999 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2007010417 (SHIMIZU RIE, et al) | by applicant | JPH10141968 | JP2006333180 |