EP2958932 - THERAPEUTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University of Singapore 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GE, Ruowen c/o National University of Singapore Faculty of Science Department of Biological Sciences 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | 02 /
CHEN, Mo c/o National University of Singapore Faculty of Science Department of Biological Sciences 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Docherty, Robert Charles Symbiosis IP Limited York Biotech Campus Office 14FA05 Sand Hutton York, YO41 1LZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Docherty, Robert Charles Symbiosis IP Limited 106 Heworth Green York YO31 7TQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14754533.9 | 18.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014SG00062 | Priority number, date | GB20130002837 | 19.02.2013 Original published format: GB 201302837 | US201361851412P | 07.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361851412 P | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014129969 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2958932 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 28.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/04, A61K38/06, A61K38/12, A61K38/16, A61K38/17, A61K45/06, A61K49/00, A61K51/00, A61K51/08, C07K5/12, C07K7/64, C12Q1/68, C07K14/46, G01N33/574, G01N33/74, A61P35/00, A61P27/02, A61P27/06, A61P3/10, A61P17/06, A61P29/00 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/461 (EP,US);
C07K7/64 (US);
A61K38/06 (EP,US);
A61K38/12 (EP,US);
A61K38/16 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K49/0056 (US);
A61K51/08 (US);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K5/123 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | C07K5/12, C07K7/64, A61K38/04, A61K38/17, A61P35/00, A61P27/02, A61P27/06, A61P3/10, A61P17/06, A61P29/00, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTIKA | [2016/01] | English: | THERAPEUTIC AGENTS | [2016/01] | French: | AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 24.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 25.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005090388 (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU], et al) [X] 1,5,8-10,12,15,16 * claims 1-3,84-100 * * paragraphs [0031] , [0071] , [0209] , [0212]; sequences 49,50,51 *; | [X]US2006057584 (BABAN SOHEYL [CA], et al) [X] 13,14 * paragraphs [0122] , [0209] , [0263]; table 1 * * claims 5,7,14,27 *; | [I]US2008003200 (ARAP WADIH [US], et al) [I] 13,14* paragraphs [0074] - [0046] *; | [X]WO2008148247 (GENE TECH PHARM GROUP DONG GUA [CN], et al) [X] 1,5 * abstract *; | [X]WO2012012693 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 13,14 * paragraphs [0127] , [0145] , [0156] , [0176] , [0233] , [0341]; claims 122-124,141-144 *; | [X]US2012040894 (GANZ TOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * claims 1,8,16 * | International search | [X]WO2008136869 (BURNHAM INST MEDICAL RESEARCH [US], et al); | [X]WO2009113965 (UNIV SINGAPORE [SG], et al); | [X] - ZHANG, Y. ET AL., "Isthmin exerts pro-survival and death-promoting effect on endothelial cells through alphavbeta5 integrin depending on its physical state", CELL DEATH AND DISEASE, (20110505), vol. 2, no. E153, doi:10.1038/CDDIS.2011.37, pages 1 - 10, XP055272191 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cddis.2011.37 | [X] - XIANG, W. ET AL., "Isthmin is a novel secreted angiogenesis inhibitor that inhibits tumour growth in mice", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (20110101), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1111/J.1582-4934.2009.00961.X, pages 359 - 374, XP055272202 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1582-4934.2009.00961.x | [L] - LEE, A. S ET AL., "GRP78 Induction in Cancer: Therapeutic and Prognostic Implications", CANCER RESEARCH, (20070415), vol. 67, no. 8, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-0325, pages 3496 - 3499, XP055045534 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-0325 | [L] - NI, M. ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (2011), vol. 434, pages 181 - 188, XP055272658 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BJ20101569 | [XP] - CHEN, M. ET AL., "Isthmin targets cell -surface GRP78 and triggers apoptosis via induction of mitochondrial dysfunction", CELL DEATH AND DIFFERENTIATION, (2014), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 797 - 810, XP055272684 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cdd.2014.3 |