EP3013498 - CRYSTALLIZER FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danieli & C. Officine Meccaniche, S.p.A. Via Nazionale 41 33042 Buttrio / IT | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LUCA, Andrea Via Candotti 61 I-33047 Remanzacco / IT | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Davide Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2016/18] | Application number, filing date | 14755142.8 | 30.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014IB62721 | Priority number, date | IT2013UD00090 | 28.06.2013 Original published format: IT UD20130090 | [2016/18] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014207729 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3013498 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3013498 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/04, B22D11/041, B22D11/055, B22D11/059 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
B22D11/04 (EP,US);
B22D11/124 (US);
B22D11/041 (EP,US);
B22D11/055 (EP,US);
B22D11/059 (EP,US);
C25D5/34 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRISTALLISATOR ZUM STRANGGIESSEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2016/18] | English: | CRYSTALLIZER FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION | [2016/18] | French: | CRISTALLISATEUR POUR COULÉE CONTINUE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA FABRICATION | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 17.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2014 | AL | 16.09.2020 | CY | 16.09.2020 | CZ | 16.09.2020 | DK | 16.09.2020 | EE | 16.09.2020 | FI | 16.09.2020 | HR | 16.09.2020 | LT | 16.09.2020 | LV | 16.09.2020 | MC | 16.09.2020 | MK | 16.09.2020 | MT | 16.09.2020 | NL | 16.09.2020 | RO | 16.09.2020 | RS | 16.09.2020 | SE | 16.09.2020 | SI | 16.09.2020 | SK | 16.09.2020 | SM | 16.09.2020 | BG | 16.12.2020 | NO | 16.12.2020 | GR | 17.12.2020 | IS | 16.01.2021 | PT | 18.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.06.2014 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MK | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 30.06.2014 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 30.06.2014 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
NO | 16.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2701636 (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3942704 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US5176197 (HAMAGUCHI CHIYOKATSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1468760 (CONCAST AG [CH]) [I] 1-22 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0035] * * claims 14,16 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP1792676 (KM EUROPA METAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1795281 (KM EUROPA METAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2436458 (EVERTZ EGON KG GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [A]WO2012069910 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT], et al) [A] 1-22 * figures 1-12 * * claim 1 * * page 4, line 12 - page 11, line 9 *; | [A]WO2012069913 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1468760 | ITUD20120192 | ITUD20120193 | ITUD20130013 |