EP3033739 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TESTING A SECURITY ELEMENT OF A SECURITY DOCUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/25] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHECKING A SECURITY ELEMENT OF A SECURITY DOCUMENT | ||
[2019/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bundesdruckerei GmbH Kommandantenstraße 18 10969 Berlin / DE | [2016/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KULIKOVSKY, Lazar Rombsweg 2 14165 Berlin / DE | 02 /
PAESCHKE, Manfred An der Wildbahn 61 16348 Wandlitz / DE | 03 /
FISCHER, Jörg Dietrichstrasse 4 13053 Berlin / DE | 04 /
KULIKOVSKA, Olga Rombsweg 2 14165 Berlin / DE | 05 /
STARICK, Detlef Gaussstrasse 3 B 17491 Greifswald / DE | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [2016/25] | Application number, filing date | 14755998.3 | 14.08.2014 | [2016/25] | WO2014EP67402 | Priority number, date | DE201310216308 | 16.08.2013 Original published format: DE102013216308 | [2016/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015022394 | Date: | 19.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3033739 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3033739 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/121, G07D7/12, G07D7/00 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
G07D7/003 (EP,US);
G07D7/12 (EP,US);
G07D7/121 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/25] | G07D7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PRÜFUNG EINES SICHERHEITSELEMENTS EINES SICHERHEITSDOKUMENTS | [2016/25] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TESTING A SECURITY ELEMENT OF A SECURITY DOCUMENT | [2019/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR VÉRIFIER UN ELEMENT DE SÉCURITÉ D'UN DOCUMENT DE SÉCURITÉ | [2019/18] |
Former [2016/25] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHECKING A SECURITY ELEMENT OF A SECURITY DOCUMENT | ||
Former [2016/25] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE VÉRIFICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE SÉCURITÉ D'UN DOCUMENT DE SÉCURITÉ | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 14.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2014 | AL | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | ES | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | IT | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | NL | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.08.2014 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 09.10.2019 | |
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 09.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1028359 (NIPPON MITSUBISHI OIL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0008] , [0030] - [0032] * * paragraphs [0048] , [0050] - [0054] ** paragraph [0064] *; | [I]WO2004013817 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - line 12 * * page 4, line 1 - line 9 * * page 5, line 11 - line 18 * * page 6, line 18 - line 25 * * page 7, line 8 - line 24 * * page 26, line 4 - line 8 * * page 26, line 19 - page 28, line 17 * * page 31, line 9 - line 29 * * figures 5,6,9 *; | [IA]EP1867977 (BANK OF ENGLAND [GB]) [I] 1-3,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] * * paragraphs [0055] , [0058] , [0070] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0135] * * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0166] * * paragraph [0186] - paragraph [0187] * * figures 5,15,21 * [A] 4,6,9; | [AD]DE102007063415 (BAM BUNDESANSTALT MATFORSCHUNG [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023] * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP2228671 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0015] *; | [A]US2011250410 (RYGAS TADEUSZ PIOTR [CA], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0053] *; | [A]US2011317150 (DECOUX ERIC [CH], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,2,5 * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0039] * | Examination | JP2007276444 |