EP2961759 - PROTEIN PURIFICATION IN THE PRESENCE OF NONIONIC ORGANIC POLYMERS AND ELECTROPOSITIVE SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology and Research 1 Fusionopolis Way 20-10 Connexis Singapore 138632 / SG | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAGNON, Peter Stanley 20 Biopolis Way Centros 06-01 Singapore 138668 / SG | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Wilson, Gary HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | Application number, filing date | 14756237.5 | 26.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014SG00084 | Priority number, date | US201361769416P | 26.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361769416 P | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014133458 | Date: | 04.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2961759 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 04.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/14, B01D15/36, C07K1/30 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
C07K1/30 (EP,US);
C07K1/165 (US);
B01D15/363 (EP,US);
C07K1/303 (EP,US);
B01D15/305 (EP,US);
B01D15/3847 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B01D15/305, B01D15/34 (US,EP);
B01D15/363, B01D15/327 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | PROTEINREINIGUNG IN GEGENWART VON NICHTIONISCHEN ORGANISCHEN POLYMEREN UND ELEKTROPOSITIVEN OBERFLÄCHEN | [2016/01] | English: | PROTEIN PURIFICATION IN THE PRESENCE OF NONIONIC ORGANIC POLYMERS AND ELECTROPOSITIVE SURFACES | [2016/01] | French: | PURIFICATION DE PROTÉINES EN PRÉSENCE DE POLYMÈRES ORGANIQUES NON IONIQUES ET DE SURFACES ÉLECTROPOSITIVES | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 22.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 23.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2005073252 (SUOMEN PUNAINEN RISTI VERIPALV [FI], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 4 * * page 8, line 10 - line 25 * * claim - *[A] 2-15 | International search | [A]WO2004092393 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2012016997 (SOLVAY [BE], et al); | [A] - LEE, JEREMY ET AL., "Principles and applications of steric exclusion chromatography.", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (2012), vol. 1270, pages 162 - 170, XP028960093 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2012.10.062 |