EP2963484 - SPECTACLE LENS PRODUCTION SYSTEM, PRODUCTION DEVICE, PRODUCTION METHOD, PRODUCTION INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, PRODUCTION INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, AND PRODUCTION INFORMATION MANAGEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOYA Corporation 7-5, Naka-Ochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-8525 / JP | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUE Takahiro C/O HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-8525 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIZAKI Hiroshi C/O HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-8525 / JP | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14757683.9 | 14.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014JP53413 | Priority number, date | JP20130036123 | 26.02.2013 Original published format: JP 2013036123 | [2016/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014132811 | Date: | 04.09.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2963484 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02C13/00, G02C7/00, G05B19/418, B24B9/14 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
B24B9/148 (EP,US);
G02C13/003 (US);
G02C7/02 (US);
G05B19/418 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32022 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37375 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | G02C13/00, G02C7/00, G05B19/418 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | BRILLENGLÄSERHERSTELLUNGSSYSTEM, HERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, HERSTELLUNGSINFORMATIONSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM, HERSTELLUNGSINFORMATIONSVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSINFORMATIONSVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/01] | English: | SPECTACLE LENS PRODUCTION SYSTEM, PRODUCTION DEVICE, PRODUCTION METHOD, PRODUCTION INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, PRODUCTION INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, AND PRODUCTION INFORMATION MANAGEMENT METHOD | [2016/01] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION DE VERRES DE LUNETTES, DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS DE PRODUCTION, DISPOSITIF DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS DE PRODUCTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS DE PRODUCTION | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2015 | Translation filed | 28.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 20.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 25.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1058294 (TOPCON CORP) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH1058294 (TOPCON CORP); | [Y]WO2007077848 (HOYA CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007203424 (NIDEK KK) | by applicant | WO2007077848 | JPH0413539 |