EP3036154 - OFFSET INSTALLATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [2018/13] |
Former [2016/26] | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAYLOT, Michel Pierre Saipem SpA Via delle Industrie 28 I-30175 Marghera / IT | 02 /
HALLOT, Raymond Saipem SA 1/7 Avenue San Fernando F-78884 St. Quentin en Yvelines / FR | 03 /
HAJERI, Yann Saipem SpA Via delle Industrie 28 I-30175 Marghera / IT | 04 /
GUEYDANE, Stephane Saipem SpA Via delle Industrie 28 I-30175 Marghera / IT | 05 /
SCARPA, Matteo Saipem SpA Via delle Industrie 28 I-30175 Marghera / IT | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Shell Legal Services IP p/a Carel van Bylandtlaan 16 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 14758064.1 | 19.08.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014US51622 | Priority number, date | US201361867483P | 19.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361867483 P | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015026778 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3036154 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3036154 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B63B22/18 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
B63B22/18 (EP,US);
B63B22/02 (US);
B63B22/04 (US);
B63B22/20 (US);
E21B19/002 (EP,US);
E21B41/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSAZT INSTALLATIONSSYSTEM | [2017/14] | English: | OFFSET INSTALLATION SYSTEMS | [2016/26] | French: | SYSTÈME D' INSTALLATION DE DECALAGE | [2017/14] |
Former [2016/26] | VERSETZTE INSTALLATIONSSYSTEME | ||
Former [2016/26] | SYSTÈMES D'INSTALLATION DÉCENTRÉS | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 07.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2014 | AL | 05.07.2017 | AT | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | ES | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | HR | 05.07.2017 | IT | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | MK | 05.07.2017 | NL | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | RS | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | SM | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | IE | 19.08.2017 | LU | 19.08.2017 | MT | 19.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | FR | 05.09.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | DE | 01.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 19.08.2014 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 05.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.08.2014 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 05.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 19.08.2014 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 05.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 19.08.2014 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 05.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.08.2014 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 05.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
MT | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 05.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 05.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 19.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3906564 (THOMPSON CLIFFORD T, et al) [X] 1,6 * figure - * [A] 10,15; | [A]US4839873 (COCHRANE JR DOUGLAS A [US], et al) [A] 1,10,15 * figure 4 *; | [XI]US5095841 (SANTOS GERALD M [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,10,11,15-20 * figure - * [I] 12; | [A]US5190107 (LANGNER CARL G [US], et al) [A] 1,10,15 * figures 1,5b *; | [A]EP2474467 (SERCEL RECH CONST ELECT [FR]) [A] 1,10,15* figure - *; | [XI]WO2013039048 (NICHU GIKEN KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,10,15-20 * figure - * [I] 11,12 |