EP3036077 - MULTI-COMPONENT INJECTION-MOLDING MACHINE HAVING A ROTATABLE CENTER PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferromatik Milacron GmbH Riegeler Strasse 4 79364 Malterdingen / DE | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIPSE, Rolf Mundingerstrasse 69 79312 Emmendingen / DE | 02 /
THÜMEN, Thorsten Heidelberger Strasse 69 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14758089.8 | 20.08.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014EP02281 | Priority number, date | DE20131013738 | 21.08.2013 Original published format: DE102013013738 | [2016/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015024657 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3036077 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/16, B29C45/04, B29C45/32, B29C45/17 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
B29C45/1628 (EP,US);
B29C45/2681 (US);
B29C45/0441 (US);
B29C45/045 (EP,US);
B29C45/1742 (EP,US);
B29C45/1761 (US);
B29C45/661 (US);
B29C45/67 (US);
B29C2045/1685 (EP,US);
B29C2045/326 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | MEHRKOMPONENTEN-SPRITZGIESSMASCHINE MIT DREHBAREM MITTELTEIL | [2016/26] | English: | MULTI-COMPONENT INJECTION-MOLDING MACHINE HAVING A ROTATABLE CENTER PART | [2016/26] | French: | MACHINE DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION À PLUSIEURS COMPOSANTS POURVUE D'UNE PARTIE CENTRALE ROTATIVE | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 07.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 06.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5773049 (KASHIWA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 13 * figure 2 *[A] 8; | [Y]WO2005077637 (FOBOHA GMBH FORMENBAU [DE], et al) [Y] 13 * page 4, lines 4-13; figure 1 * * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 7 * * page 10, line 29 - page 11, lines 3,7,8-10 * * page 17, lines 1,20-21 *; | [YA]JP2011031535 (UBE MACHINERY CORP LTD) [Y] 1-7,9-13 * paragraphs [0006] , [0013] , [0023] , [0025]; figures 1,3 * [A] 8; | [Y]WO2011107395 (FOBOHA GMBH FORMENBAU [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7,9-13 * page 1, lines 6-10 * * page 4, lines 19-22 * * page 11, lines 15-24; figures 1-3,8-10 *; | [Y]DE102011118970 (KRAUSS MAFFEI TECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2 * columns 1,2,3-5; figure 4 * * columns 8,11,14 * * column 18 * | Examination | US2012049408 | CH705140 | - "ALLES DREHT SICH", KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG, MUNCHEN, DE, (20050101), ISSN 0023-5563, page 77, XP001205070 | - DASSOW J, "FUER ALLE FAELLE GERUESTET. TECHNOLOGIEFUEHRERSCHAFT DURCH MEHRKOMPONENTENTECHNIK", KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG, MUNCHEN, DE, (20020901), vol. 92, no. 9, ISSN 0023-5563, pages 105 - 109, XP001125593 |