EP3041738 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING ELECTRICAL ENERGY BY MEANS OF A TETHERED FLYING OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TwingTec AG Überlandstrasse 129 8600 Dübendorf / CH | For all designated states EMPA Überlandstrasse 129 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCHSINGER, Rolf Büelweg 8 CH-8607 Seegräben / CH | 02 /
GOHL, Flavio Schulhausstrasse 12 CH-8340 Hinwil / CH | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | Rutz, Andrea Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2018/12] |
Former [2016/28] | Rutz, Andrea Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 14758112.8 | 26.08.2014 | [2016/28] | WO2014EP68067 | Priority number, date | CH20130001554 | 07.09.2013 Original published format: CH 15542013 | CH20130001555 | 08.09.2013 Original published format: CH 15552013 | [2016/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015032652 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3041738 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3041738 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/00, B64C31/06, F03D5/00 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
F03D5/00 (EP);
B64C31/06 (EP,US);
F03D7/00 (EP);
Y02E10/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/28] | B64C31/06, F03D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE MITTELS EINES GEBUNDENEN FLUGOBJEKTES | [2018/11] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING ELECTRICAL ENERGY BY MEANS OF A TETHERED FLYING OBJECT | [2016/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR GÉNÉRER DE L'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE AU MOYEN D'UN OBJET VOLANT AMARRÉ | [2016/28] |
Former [2016/28] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE MITTELS EINEN GEBUNDENEN FLUGOBJEKTS | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2014 | AL | 21.03.2018 | AT | 21.03.2018 | CY | 21.03.2018 | CZ | 21.03.2018 | DK | 21.03.2018 | EE | 21.03.2018 | ES | 21.03.2018 | FI | 21.03.2018 | HR | 21.03.2018 | IT | 21.03.2018 | LT | 21.03.2018 | LV | 21.03.2018 | MC | 21.03.2018 | MK | 21.03.2018 | NL | 21.03.2018 | PL | 21.03.2018 | RO | 21.03.2018 | RS | 21.03.2018 | SE | 21.03.2018 | SI | 21.03.2018 | SK | 21.03.2018 | SM | 21.03.2018 | TR | 21.03.2018 | BG | 21.06.2018 | NO | 21.06.2018 | GR | 22.06.2018 | IS | 21.07.2018 | PT | 23.07.2018 | GB | 26.08.2018 | IE | 26.08.2018 | LU | 26.08.2018 | MT | 26.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | FR | 31.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 26.08.2014 | |
AL | 21.03.2018 | ||
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MK | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
GB | 26.08.2018 | ||
IE | 26.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
MT | 26.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.08.2014 | |
AL | 21.03.2018 | ||
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
GB | 26.08.2018 | ||
IE | 26.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
MT | 26.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
GB | 26.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
MT | 26.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
GB | 26.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
MT | 26.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
GB | 26.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5120006 (HADZICKI JOSEPH R [US]) [Y] 6,9-11 * column 9, lines 25-45 *; | [A]WO0158755 (LYNN PETER ROBERT [NZ]) [A] 6,9-11* page 13 - page 14 *; | [XY]US2002040948 (RAGNER GARY DEAN [US]) [X] 1-5,12-16 * page 4, paragraph 21 - paragraph 23; figure 2 * * page 16, paragraph 143; figure 15 * * page 11, paragraph 115 * * page 15, paragraph 139 - paragraph 141 * * page 14, paragraph 130 * [Y] 6-11; | [Y]WO2010148373 (JOBY ENERGY INC [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * page 9, paragraph 35 - paragraph 36; figure 2b *; | [X]WO2011121557 (KITENERGY S R L [IT], et al) [X] 5,15 * page 11, line 16 - line 17 * * page 12, line 9 - line 16 * * page 9, line 4 - line 11; figure 2 * * page 10, line 9 - line 18 *; | [A] - Martin Hepperle, "Basic Design of Flying Wing Models Airfoils for Flying Wings", (20021201), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.mh-aerotools.de/airfoils/flywing1.htm, (20141009), XP055145526 [A] 6,9-11 * the whole document * |