EP3030506 - CONVEYOR SYSTEM COMPRISING A FRICTION COEFFICIENT MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rexnord Flattop Europe B.V. Einsteinstraat 1 2691 GV 's-Gravenzande / NL | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN BERG, Rick Wilhelmus c/o Einsteinstraat 1 NL-2691 GV 's-Gravenzande / NL | 02 /
MENKE, Cornelis Hendrik Mijndert c/o Einsteinstraat 1 NL-2691 GV 's-Gravenzande / NL | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2016/24] | Application number, filing date | 14758698.6 | 06.08.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014NL50551 | Priority number, date | NL20132011275 | 07.08.2013 Original published format: NL 2011275 | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015020524 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3030506 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3030506 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65G45/02, G01N19/02 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
B65G45/02 (EP,US);
B65G43/00 (US);
B65G45/10 (US);
G01N19/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÖRDERANLAGE MIT EINER REIBUNGSKOEFFIZIENTEN-MESSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/24] | English: | CONVEYOR SYSTEM COMPRISING A FRICTION COEFFICIENT MEASURING DEVICE | [2016/24] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE COEFFICIENT DE FROTTEMENT | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 19.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2014 | AL | 05.09.2018 | AT | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | CZ | 05.09.2018 | DK | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | ES | 05.09.2018 | FI | 05.09.2018 | HR | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MK | 05.09.2018 | MT | 05.09.2018 | PL | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | RS | 05.09.2018 | SE | 05.09.2018 | SI | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | SM | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | NO | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.08.2014 | |
AL | 05.09.2018 | ||
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
MT | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.08.2014 | |
AL | 05.09.2018 | ||
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3977231 (HAEHNER CARL L, et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]DE3340457 (HOLSTEIN & KAPPERT MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 11 - page 7; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2002062678 (AHN HYO SOK [KR], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]EP1790968 (SUNBIRD INVEST LTD [GB]) [AD] 8,9,39* figure 2; claim 1 *; | [XD]WO2010063040 (IMPROCHEM PTY LTD [ZA], et al) [XD] 1 * paragraphs [0013] - [0018]; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1790968 | WO2010063040 |