EP3011484 - METHOD FOR SIMULATING A DEFLECTION RADIUS OF A MOTOR VEHICLE TYRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2022/36] |
Former [2018/44] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
Former [2016/17] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUISSON, Jérémy C/o. MANUFACTURE FRANCAISE DES PNEUMATIQUES MICHELIN DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux F-63040 Clermont-ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
VIRIN, Teddy C/o. MANUFACTURE FRANCAISE DES PNEUMATIQUES MICHELIN DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux F-63040 Clermont-ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | Roussy, Delphine M. F. P. MICHELIN 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux Service juridique - Propriété Intellectuelle DCJ/PI - F35 - Site de Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2022/36] |
Former [2016/17] | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14759010.3 | 23.07.2014 | [2016/17] | WO2014FR51909 | Priority number, date | FR20130057695 | 02.08.2013 Original published format: FR 1357695 | [2016/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015015093 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3011484 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3011484 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F30/15, G06F30/20 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
B60C99/006 (EP,US);
G06F17/11 (US);
G06F30/15 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/82 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | G06F17/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SIMULATION EINES ABLENKUNGSRADIUS EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGREIFENS | [2016/17] | English: | METHOD FOR SIMULATING A DEFLECTION RADIUS OF A MOTOR VEHICLE TYRE | [2016/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE SIMULATION DE RAYON ECRASE DE PNEUMATIQUE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 05.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.09.2022 | AT | 07.09.2022 | CZ | 07.09.2022 | DK | 07.09.2022 | EE | 07.09.2022 | ES | 07.09.2022 | FI | 07.09.2022 | HR | 07.09.2022 | IT | 07.09.2022 | LT | 07.09.2022 | LV | 07.09.2022 | MC | 07.09.2022 | NL | 07.09.2022 | PL | 07.09.2022 | RO | 07.09.2022 | RS | 07.09.2022 | SE | 07.09.2022 | SI | 07.09.2022 | SK | 07.09.2022 | SM | 07.09.2022 | NO | 07.12.2022 | GR | 08.12.2022 | IS | 07.01.2023 | PT | 09.01.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/14] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MC | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [IY] - K. GUO ET AL, "UniTire: unified tire model for vehicle dynamic simulation", VEHICLE SYSTEM DYNAMICS, (2007), vol. 45, no. sup1, doi:10.1080/00423110701816742, ISSN 0042-3114, pages 79 - 99, XP055111320 [I] 1-3,9,10 * pages 79, 82, 87 et 93 * [Y] 4-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00423110701816742 | [YA] - BENOIT DURAND-GASSELIN ET AL, "Assessing the thermo-mechanical TaMeTirE model in offline vehicle simulation and driving simulator tests", VEHICLE SYSTEM DYNAMICS, (201012), vol. 48, no. sup1, doi:10.1080/00423111003706730, ISSN 0042-3114, pages 211 - 229, XP055111255 [Y] 4-8 * page 212 * [A] 1-3,9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00423111003706730 | [A] - Leon Merkx, "Overturning moment analysis using the Flat plank tyre tester", DCT 2004-78, (2004), URL: http://alexandria.tue.nl/repository/books/625826.pdf, (201404), XP055111335 [A] 1-10 * pages 11-15 et 27 * | [A] - D. LU ET AL, "Modelling of tire overturning moment and loaded radius", VEHICLE SYSTEM DYNAMICS, (2006), vol. 44, no. sup1, doi:10.1080/00423110600869297, ISSN 0042-3114, pages 104 - 114, XP055111274 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00423110600869297 | Examination | JP2004161210 | WO2012071379 | - D. Lu ET AL, "Modelling of tire overturning moment and loaded radius", Vehicle System Dynamics, (20060101), vol. 44, no. sup1, doi:10.1080/00423110600869297, ISSN 0042-3114, pages 104 - 114, XP055111274 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00423110600869297 |