EP2997693 - SECURE SESSION CAPABILITY USING PUBLIC-KEY CRYPTOGRAPHY WITHOUT ACCESS TO THE PRIVATE KEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cloudflare, Inc. 101 Townsend St. San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2022/39] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Cloudflare, Inc. 665 Third Street, Suite 207 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | ||
Former [2016/12] | For all designated states Cloudflare Inc. 665 Third Street Suite 207 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAHL, Sebastian Andreas Henry San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 02 /
TOURNE, Matthieu Philippe Francois San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 03 /
SIKORA, Piotr San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 04 /
BEJJANI, Ray Raymond San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 05 /
KNECHT, Dane Orion San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 06 /
PRINCE, Matthew Browning San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 07 /
GRAHAM-CUMMING, John San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 08 /
HALLOWAY, Lee Hahn San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2022/39] |
Former [2016/12] | 01 /
PAHL, Sebastian Andreas Henry 665 Third Street Suite 207 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | ||
02 /
TOURNE, Matthieu Philippe Francois 665 Third Street Suite 207 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | |||
03 /
SIKORA, Piotr 665 Third Street Suite 207 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | |||
04 /
BEJJANI, Ray Raymond 665 Third Street Suite 207 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | |||
05 /
KNECHT, Dane Orion 665 Third Street Suite 207 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | |||
06 /
PRINCE, Matthew Browning 665 Third Street Suite 207 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | |||
07 /
GRAHAM-CUMMING, John 665 Third Street Suite 207 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | |||
08 /
HALLOWAY, Lee Hahn 665 Third Street Suite 207 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/39] |
Former [2016/12] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14759676.1 | 06.03.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014US21434 | Priority number, date | US201313788784 | 07.03.2013 Original published format: US201313788784 | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014138494 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2997693 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2997693 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04L9/08, G06F21/33 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
H04L63/062 (EP);
H04L63/0435 (EP,US);
G06F21/335 (EP,US);
H04L63/0442 (US);
H04L63/061 (US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L63/0869 (US);
H04L63/166 (EP,US);
H04L9/0825 (EP,US);
H04L9/0841 (US);
H04L9/0869 (US);
H04L9/3263 (US);
H04L2463/061 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/07] | H04L9/08, H04L29/06, G06F21/33 | ||
Former IPC [2016/12] | H04L9/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERE SITZUNGSKAPAZITÄT UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES KRYPTOGRAFIESYSTEMS MIT ÖFFENTLICHEM SCHLÜSSEL OHNE ZUGANG ZUM PRIVATEN SCHLÜSSEL | [2016/12] | English: | SECURE SESSION CAPABILITY USING PUBLIC-KEY CRYPTOGRAPHY WITHOUT ACCESS TO THE PRIVATE KEY | [2016/12] | French: | CAPACITÉ DE SESSION SÉCURISÉE À L'AIDE DE LA CRYPTOGRAPHIE À CLÉ PUBLIQUE SANS AVOIR ACCÈS À LA CLÉ PRIVÉE | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 13.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2016/12] | 11.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 07.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.08.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 22.08.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.08.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 11.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2016 | Decision despatched | 11.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 11.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 11.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2016 | Decision despatched | 11.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 11.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2016 | Decision despatched | 11.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.09.2022 | AT | 28.09.2022 | CZ | 28.09.2022 | DK | 28.09.2022 | EE | 28.09.2022 | ES | 28.09.2022 | FI | 28.09.2022 | HR | 28.09.2022 | LT | 28.09.2022 | LV | 28.09.2022 | MC | 28.09.2022 | PL | 28.09.2022 | RO | 28.09.2022 | RS | 28.09.2022 | SE | 28.09.2022 | SI | 28.09.2022 | SK | 28.09.2022 | SM | 28.09.2022 | NO | 28.12.2022 | GR | 29.12.2022 | IS | 28.01.2023 | PT | 30.01.2023 | IE | 06.03.2023 | LU | 06.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/12] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
IE | 06.03.2023 | ||
LU | 06.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
IE | 06.03.2023 | ||
LU | 06.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 06.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004161110 (KANAI TATSUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,13,14 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0049] * [I] 2,3,6,7,9-12; | [A]US2013031356 (PRINCE MATTHEW BROWNING [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0114] , [0117] , [0121] ** paragraphs [0122] - [0124] *; | [XPI]WO2013090894 (AKAMAI TECH INC [US]) [XP] 1,4,5,8,13,14 * page 8 - page 11 * [I] 2,3,6,7,9-12 | International search | [Y]US2006005017 (BLACK ALISTAIR D [US], et al); | [Y]US2006294366 (NADALIN ANTHONY J [US], et al) | Examination | - JAGER TIBOR ET AL, On the Security of TLS-DHE in the Standard Model, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER ANALYSIS OF IMAGES AND PATTERNS. CAIP 2017: COMPUTER ANALYSIS OF IMAGES AND PATTERNS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 273 - 293, (20120819), ISBN 978-3-642-17318-9, XP047339188 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-32009-5_17 | by applicant | US2004161110 | US2006005017 | US2006294366 | WO2013090894 |