EP2964317 - FLEXIBLE THERAPY ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoll Medical Corporation 269 Mill Road Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | [2016/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAIB, Thomas, E. 2810 Ipnar Road North Huntingdon, PA 15642 / US | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14760986.1 | 19.02.2014 | [2016/02] | WO2014US17130 | Priority number, date | US201313784074 | 04.03.2013 Original published format: US201313784074 | [2016/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014137595 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2964317 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/04 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
A61N1/0484 (EP,US);
A61B5/256 (US);
A61B5/266 (US);
A61B5/27 (US);
A61B5/28 (US);
A61B5/6804 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODE FÜR FLEXIBLE THERAPIEN | [2016/02] | English: | FLEXIBLE THERAPY ELECTRODE | [2016/02] | French: | ÉLECTRODE DE THÉRAPIE SOUPLE | [2016/02] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 27.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5078134 (HEILMAN MARLIN S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 14, line 36 - column 16, line 29 *; | [A]US7206630 (TARLER MATTHEW DAVID [US]) [A] 1-15* column 15, lines 18-46; figure 1 *; | [A]US2012150008 (KAIB THOMAS E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0022] * | International search | [XY]US5078134 (HEILMAN MARLIN S [US], et al) [X] 1, 2 * entire document * [Y] 3-20; | [Y]US2003158593 (HEILMAN MARLIN S [US], et al) [Y] 17* entire document *; | [Y]US2011028822 (BECK JAMES C [US]) [Y] 16 * entire document *; | [Y]US7970451 (HASSONJEE QAIZAR N [US], et al) [Y] 7, 8 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012150008 (KAIB THOMAS E [US], et al) [Y] 3-20 * entire document * |