EP3036256 - MODULATION OF TUMOR IMMUNITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [2022/42] |
Former [2016/26] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GU, Danling 901 S. California Avenue Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 02 /
BEEBE, Amy M. 901 S. California Avenue Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Böhles, Elena, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2016/26] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14761460.6 | 18.08.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014US51402 | Priority number, date | US201361867976P | 20.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361867976 P | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015026684 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3036256 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3036256 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P35/00, A61K39/395 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K39/3955 (IL,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K39/39558 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (KR);
C07K2317/565 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Extension states | BA | 21.03.2016 | ME | 21.03.2016 | Title | German: | MODULATION DER TUMORIMMUNITÄT | [2016/26] | English: | MODULATION OF TUMOR IMMUNITY | [2016/26] | French: | MODULATION D'IMMUNITÉ TUMORALE | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 12.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20190848.0 / EP3770175 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.07.2021
30.07.2021
ADMISSIBLE Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown NY 10591 / US Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 02
28.07.2021
30.07.2021
ADMISSIBLE Pajaro Limited 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1JP / GB Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.07.2021
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown NY 10591 / US Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | ||
02
28.07.2021
Pajaro Limited 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1JP / GB Opponent's representative Höpfner, Sebastian Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 DE-80333 München / DE | 11.08.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.12.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.06.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/48] | 12.07.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 25.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.10.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.11.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 28.11.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.12.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 28.10.2020 | SM | 28.10.2020 | [2022/18] |
Former [2021/32] | SM | 28.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2011028683 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [XD] 18 * paragraph [0196]; example 5; table 8 *; | [YD]WO2013019906 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-7,10,11,18,19 * claims 1-50 *; | [Y] - I. MELERO ET AL, "Clinical Development of Immunostimulatory Monoclonal Antibodies and Opportunities for Combination", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (20130301), vol. 19, no. 5, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2214, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 997 - 1008, XP055151065 [Y] 1-7,10,11,18,19 * abstract * * page 1000, column l, paragraph 1 - page 1002, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 1004, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 1004, column r, paragraph l - page 1005, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2214 | [IA] - DAVID A SCHAER ET AL, "Modulation of GITR for cancer immunotherapy", CURRENT OPINION IN IMMUNOLOGY, (20120401), vol. 24, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.coi.2011.12.011, ISSN 0952-7915, pages 217 - 224, XP055150991 [I] 1-7,10,11,18,19 * paragraph [introduction] * * page 220, column r, paragraph l * [A] 8,9,12-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coi.2011.12.011 | [Y] - KO K ET AL, "TREATMENT OF ADVANCED TUMORS WITH AGONISTIC ANTI-GITR MAB AND ITS EFFECTS ON TUMOR-INFILTRATING FOXP3(+)CD25(+)CD4(+) REGULATORY T CELLS", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, (20051003), vol. 202, no. 7, doi:10.1084/JEM.20050940, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 885 - 891, XP009076415 [Y] 1-7,10,11,18,19 * abstract * * paragraph [results]; figure 4 * | [XP] - LEI LU ET AL, "Combined PD-1 blockade and GITR triggering induce a potent antitumor immunity in murine cancer models and synergizes with chemotherapeutic drugs", JOURNAL OF TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20140207), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1479-5876-12-36, ISSN 1479-5876, page 36, XP021176018 [XP] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1479-5876-12-36 | by applicant | US4683195 | US4816567 | EP0404097 | WO9311161 | WO9404678 | WO9425591 | US5624821 | US6005079 | US6150584 | US6326482 | US6329511 | US6420140 | US6458592 | WO03086310 | WO2005047326 | WO2005120571 | WO2006005770 | US2006014225 | WO2006105021 | WO2008156712 | US7521051 | WO2010077634 | WO2011028683 | US8008449 | US8354509 | WO2013019906 | US8383796 | - HANABUCHI ET AL., BLOOD, (2006), vol. 107, pages 3617 - 3623 | - NOCENTINI; RICCARDI, EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 35, pages 1016 - 1022 | - MCHUGH ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2002), vol. 16, pages 311 - 323 | - SHIMIZU ET AL., NAT. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 3, pages 135 - 142 | - RONCHETTI ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 34, pages 613 - 622 | - TONE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 15059 - 15064 | - SUVAS ET AL., J. VIROL., (2005), vol. 79, pages 11935 - 11942 | - SHIN ET AL., CYTOKINE, (2002), vol. 19, pages 187 - 192 | - CUZZOCREA ET AL., J. LEUKOC. BIOL., (2004), vol. 76, pages 933 - 940 | - SHEVACH ET AL., NAT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 6, pages 613 - 618 | - CUZZOCREA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 177, pages 631 - 641 | - CUZZOCREA ET AL., FASEB J., (2007), vol. 21, pages 117 - 129 | - KO ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2005), vol. 7, pages 885 - 891 | - ZHANG, X. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2004), vol. 20, pages 337 - 347 | - LIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2008), vol. 105, pages 3011 - 6 | - BROWN, J. A., ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 170, pages 1257 - 1266 | - DONG H., NAT. MED., (2002), vol. 8, pages 793 - 800 | - WINTTERLE ET AL., CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 63, pages 7462 - 7467 | - STROME, S. E. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 63, pages 6501 - 6505 | - THOMPSON, R. H., CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 66, pages 3381 - 5 | - THOMPSON ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 13, pages 1757 - 61 | - NOMI, T. ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 13, pages 2151 - 7 | - OKAZAKI; HONJO, INT. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 19, pages 813 - 824 | - NOMI, T. ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 13, pages 2151 - 2157 | - TSUSHIMA, F. ET AL., ORAL ONCOL., (2006), vol. 42, pages 268 - 274 | - NOCENTINI, G. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 6216 - 622 | - WHO DRUG INFORMATION, (2013), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 161 - 162 | - WHO DRUG INFORMATION, (2013), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 68 - 69 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - PLUCKTHUN, THE PHARMACOLOGY OF MO OC O A ANTIBODIES, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - MUYLDERMANS ET AL., TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., (2001), vol. 26, page 230 | - REICHMANN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1999), vol. 231, page 25 | - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - HOLLIGER; HUDSON, NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 23, pages 1126 - 1136 | - PRESTA, ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (2006), vol. 58, pages 640 - 656 | - PRESTA, J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 116, pages 731 - 734,735 | - MILSTEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 537 - 39 | - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 81 | - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. US.A., (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 48 | - GRUBER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, page 5368 | - J. MOL. BIOL., vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - MULLIS ET AL., COLD SPRING HARBOR SYMP. QUANT. BIOL., (1987), vol. 51, page 263 | - GIUDICELLI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2005), vol. 33, pages D256 - D261 | - KNIGHT, ANN. CLIN. LAB. SCI., (2000), vol. 30, pages 145 - 158 | - HOOD; CHERESH, NATURE REV. CANCER, (2002), vol. 2, pages 91 - 100 | - TIMME ET AL., CURR. DRUG TARGETS, (2003), vol. 4, pages 251 - 261 | - ROBBINS; ITZKOWITZ, MED. CLIN. NORTH AM., (2002), vol. 86, pages 1467 - 1495 | - GRADY; MARKOWITZ, ANNU. REV. GENOMICS HUM. GENET., (2002), vol. 3, pages 101 - 128 | - BAUER ET AL., GLIA, (2001), vol. 36, pages 235 - 243 | - STANIMIROVIC; SATOH, BRAIN PATHOL., (2000), vol. 10, pages 113 - 126 | - CASSET ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN, (2003), vol. 307, pages 198 - 205 | - MUYLDERMANS, J. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 74, pages 277 - 302 | - LI, NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 18, pages 1251 - 1256 | - APOSTOLOPOULOS ET AL., CURR. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 9, pages 411 - 420 | - MONFARDINI ET AL., CURR. PHARM. DES., (2002), vol. 8, pages 2185 - 2199 | - DOMINGUES ET AL., NAT. STRUCT. BIOL., (1999), vol. 6, pages 652 - 656 | - SATO; SONE, BIOCHEM. J., (2003), vol. 371, pages 603 - 608 | - STAHLI ET AL., Methods in Enzymology, (1983), vol. 9, page 242 | - KIRKLAND ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 137, page 3614 | - MOREL ET AL., MOI. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 25, no. 1, page 7 | - CHEUNG ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1990), vol. 176, page 546 | - MOLDENHAUER ET AL., SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 32, page 77 | - MUNSEN ET AL., ANALYT. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 107, pages 220 - 239 | - BAERT ET AL., New Engl. J. Med., (2003), vol. 348, pages 601 - 608 | - MILGROM ET AL., New Engl. J. Med., (1999), vol. 341, pages 1966 - 1973 | - SLAMON ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2001), vol. 344, pages 783 - 792 | - BENIAMINOVITZ ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2000), vol. 342, pages 613 - 619 | - GHOSH ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2003), vol. 348, pages 24 - 32 | - LIPSKY ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2000), vol. 343, pages 1594 - 1602 | - YANG ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2003), vol. 349, pages 427 - 434 | - HEROLD ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2002), vol. 346, pages 1692 - 1698 | - LIU ET AL., J. NEUROL. NEUROSURG. PSYCH., (1999), vol. 67, pages 451 - 456 | - PORTIELJI ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., vol. 52, pages 133 - 144 | - AGNEW, CHEM. INTL. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, pages 183 - 186 | - WU, Recombinant DNA, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1993), vol. 217 | - AUSBEL ET AL., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (2001), vol. 1-4 | - COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protocols in Protein Science, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (2000), vol. 1 | - COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protocols in Protein Science, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (2000), vol. 2 | - AUSUBEL ET AL., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (2001), vol. 3, pages 16.0.5 - 16.22.17 | - Products for Life Science Research, LOUIS, MO, (2001), pages 45 - 89 | - BIODIRECTORY, (2001), pages 384 - 391 | - COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protcols in Immunology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (2001), vol. 1 | - COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protcols in Immunology, JOHN WILEY, INC., (2001), vol. 4 | - HARLOW; LANE, Antibodies A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1988), pages 139 - 243 | - CARPENTER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 165, page 6205 | - HE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, page 1029 | - TANG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 27371 - 27378 | - BACA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 10678 - 10684 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 877 - 883 | - FOOTE; WINTER, J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 224, pages 487 - 499 | - VAUGHAN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 309 - 314 | - BARBAS, NATURE MEDICINE, (1995), vol. 1, pages 837 - 839 | - MENDEZ ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1997), vol. 15, pages 146 - 156 | - HOOGENBOOM; CHAMES, IMMUNOL. TODAY, (2000), vol. 21, pages 371 - 377 | - DE BRUIN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 17, pages 397 - 399 | - MEYAARD ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1997), vol. 7, pages 283 - 290 | - WRIGHT ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2000), vol. 13, pages 233 - 2 2 | - KAITHAMANA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 163, pages 5157 - 5164 | - LE DOUSSAL ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 146, pages 169 - 175 | - GIBELLINI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, pages 3891 - 3898 | - HSING; BISHOP, J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 162, pages 2804 - 2811 | - EVERTS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 168, pages 883 - 889 | - MENNE ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2000), vol. 16, pages 741 - 742 | - MENNE ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS APPLICATIONS NOTE, (2000), vol. 16, pages 741 - 742 | - WREN ET AL., COMPUT. METHODS PROGRAMS BIOMED., (2002), vol. 68, pages 177 - 181 | - VON HEIJNE, EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1983), vol. 133, pages 17 - 21 | - VON HEIJNE, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, pages 4683 - 4690 | - LEFRANC, M.-P. ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, pages 209 - 212 | - COHEN ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2010), vol. 5, page E10436 | - SCHAER ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. RES., (2013), vol. 1, pages 320 - 331 | - LEVITSKY ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (2013), vol. 96, pages 689 - 696 | Opposition | WO2011028683 | WO2012145493 | WO2015026684 | WO2004107618 | WO2006105021 | WO2013019906 | WO2017214548 | EP3036256 | - "FDA Approves New Immunotherapy for Metastatic Melanoma", FDA Approves New Immunotherapy for Metastatic Melanoma, (20110325), XP055831681 | - "Phase I study of MK -3475 (anti-PD-i monoclonal antibody) in patients with advanced solid tumors", Journal of Clinical Oncology, (20120520), vol. 30, no. 15, pages 2512 - 2512, XP055831683 | - DAVID A SCHAER et al., "Modulation of GITR for cancer immunotherapy", Curr Opin Immunol, (20120400), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 217 - 224, XP055150991 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coi.2011.12.011 | - MIKAYEL MKRTICHYAN et al., "Anti-PD-1 synergizes with cyclophosphamide to inducepotent anti-tumor vaccine effects through novelmechanisms", Eur. J. Immunol., (20110000), vol. 41, pages 2977 - 2986, XP055831685 | - ADEEGBE et al., "Natural and induced! regulatory cells in cancer", Frontiers in Immunology, (20130700), vol. 4, no. Article 190, page 9, XP055831686 | - GENEVIEVE M. WEI et al., "Immune Modulation by Chemotherapy or Immunotherapy to Enhance Cancer Vaccines", Cancers, (20110000), vol. 3, pages 3114 - 3142, XP055184265 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/cancers3033114 | - ANGELA D. PARDEE, "CANCER IMMUNOTHERAPY TARGETING T CELL COSTIMULATORY MOLECULES", Dissertation, (20100000), XP055831689 | - ASAD JAVED et al., "PD-L1 expression in tumor metastasis isdifferent between uveal melanoma and cutaneous melanoma", Immunotherapy, (20170000), vol. 9, no. 16, pages 1323 - 1330, XP055750914 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2217/imt-2017-0066 | - MUSTAFA KHASRAW et al., "PD-1 Inhibitors: Do they have a Future in the Treatment of (g)Glioblastoma?", Clin Cancer Res, (20201015), vol. 26, no. 20, pages 5287 - 5296, XP055750968 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-20-1135 | - IGNACIO MELERO et al., "Clinical Development of Immunostimulatory Monoclonal Antibodies and Opportunities for Combination", Clin Cancer Res, (20130301), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 997 - 1108, XP055151065 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2214 | - I. Melero, A. M. Grimaldi, J. L. Perez-Gracia, P. A. Ascierto, "Clinical Development of Immunostimulatory Monoclonal Antibodies and Opportunities for Combination", Clinical Cancer Research, Association for Cancer Research, (20130301), vol. 19, no. 5, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2214, ISSN 10780432, pages 997 - 1008, XP055151065 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2214 | - David A Schaer, Judith T Murphy, Jedd D Wolchok, "Modulation of GITR for cancer immunotherapy", Current Opinion in Immunology, Elsevier Current Trends, (20120401), vol. 24, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.coi.2011.12.011, ISSN 09527915, pages 217 - 224, XP055150991 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coi.2011.12.011 | - KO K, ET AL., "TREATMENT OF ADVANCED TUMORS WITH AGONISTIC ANTI-GITR MAB AND ITS EFFECTS ON TUMOR-INFILTRATING FOXP3(+)CD25(+)CD4(+) REGULATORY T CELLS", Journal of Experimental Medicine, Rockefeller University Press, US, US , (20051003), vol. 202, no. 07, doi:10.1084/jem.20050940, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 885 - 891, XP009076415 | - Adam D. Cohen Et Al.,, "Agonist Anti-GITR Antibody Enhances Vaccine-Induced CD8+ T-Cell Responses and Tumor Immunity /NIH Author Manuscript/", Cancer Research, (20060501), vol. 66, no. 9, pages 4904 - 4912, XP055366522 | - Schaer David A; Cohen Adam D; Wolchok Jedd D, "Anti-GITR antibodies--potential clinical applications for tumor immunotherapy", Current Opinion in Investigational Drugs, Thomson Reuters (Scientific) Ltd., London, UK, London, UK , (20101201), vol. 11, no. 12, ISSN 2040-3429, pages 1378 - 1386, XP009166226 | - Adam D. Cohen, Schaer David, Liu Cailian, Li Yanyun, Hirschhorn Cymmerman Daniel, Kim Soo, Diab Adi, Rizzuto Gabrielle, Duan Fei, Perales Miguel, Merghoub Taha, Houghton Alan, Wolchok Jedd, Unutmaz Derya, "Agonist Anti-GITR Monoclonal Antibody Induces Melanoma Tumor Immunity in Mice by Altering Regulatory T Cell Stability and Intra-Tumor Accumulation", PLoS ONE, Public Library of Science, (20100503), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0010436, page e10436, XP055150996 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0010436 | - J. Mitsui, H. Nishikawa, D. Muraoka, L. Wang, T. Noguchi, E. Sato, S. Kondo, J. P. Allison, S. Sakaguchi, L. J. Old, T. Kato, H. Shiku, "Two Distinct Mechanisms of Augmented Antitumor Activity by Modulation of Immunostimulatory/Inhibitory Signals", Clinical Cancer Research, Association for Cancer Research, (20100515), vol. 16, no. 10, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-09-3243, ISSN 10780432, pages 2781 - 2791, XP055100557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-09-3243 | - Fernando Aranda, Erika Vacchelli, Alexander Eggermont, Jérôme Galon, Wolf Hervé Fridman, Laurence Zitvogel, Guido Kroemer, Lorenzo Galluzzi, "Trial Watch : Immunostimulatory monoclonal antibodies in cancer therapy", OncoImmunology, (20140201), vol. 3, no. 2, doi:10.4161/onci.27297, page e27297, XP055588520 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/onci.27297 | - Ethan M. Shevach, Geoffrey L. Stephens, "The GITR-GITRL interaction: co-stimulation or contrasuppression of regulatory activity?", Nature Reviews Immunology, Nature Pub. Group, (20060801), vol. 6, no. 8, doi:10.1038/nri1867, ISSN 14741733, pages 613 - 618, XP055106131 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri1867 | - FLIES DALLAS B, ET AL, "Blockade of the B7-H1/PD-1 Pathway for Cancer Immunotherapy", YALE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, NEW HAVEN, CT, US, US , (20111201), vol. 84, no. 4, pages 409 - 421, XP002711444 | - Peggs Karl S., Quezada Sergio A., "PD-1 blockade : promoting endogenous anti-tumor immunity", Expert Reviews, Anticancer Ther., (20121001), vol. 12, no. 10, pages 1279 - 1282, XP055934059 | - I. Melero, D. Hirschhorn-Cymerman, A. Morales-Kastresana, M. F. Sanmamed, J. D. Wolchok, "Agonist Antibodies to TNFR Molecules That Costimulate T and NK Cells", Clinical Cancer Research, Association for Cancer Research, (20130301), vol. 19, no. 5, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2065, ISSN 10780432, pages 1044 - 1053, XP055132838 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2065 | - Topalian S L, Drake C G, Pardoll D M, "Targeting the PD-1/B7-H1(PD-L1) pathway to activate anti-tumor immunity", Current Opinion in Immunology, ELSEVIER, OXFORD., GB, GB , (20120401), vol. 24, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.coi.2011.12.009, ISSN 0952-7915, pages 207 - 212, XP002714810 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coi.2011.12.009 | - M. Sznol, L. Chen, "Antagonist Antibodies to PD-1 and B7-H1 (PD-L1) in the Treatment of Advanced Human Cancer", Clinical Cancer Research, Association for Cancer Research, (20130301), vol. 19, no. 5, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2063, ISSN 10780432, pages 1021 - 1034, XP055123957 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2063 | - R. H. Vonderheide, M. J. Glennie, "Agonistic CD40 Antibodies and Cancer Therapy", Clinical Cancer Research, Association for Cancer Research, (20130301), vol. 19, no. 5, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2064, ISSN 10780432, pages 1035 - 1043, XP055218372 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-2064 | - Schaer David A., Budhu Sadna, Liu Cailian, Bryson Campbell, Malandro Nicole, Cohen Adam, Zhong Hong, Yang Xia, Houghton Alan N., Merghoub Taha, Wolchok Jedd D., "GITR Pathway Activation Abrogates Tumor Immune Suppression through Loss of Regulatory T-cell Lineage Stability", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY RESEARCH, American Association for Cancer Research, US, US , (20131101), vol. 1, no. 5, doi:10.1158/2326-6066.CIR-13-0086, ISSN 2326-6066, pages 320 - 331, XP055886628 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2326-6066.CIR-13-0086 | - HIRANO FUMIYA ET AL, "Blockade of B7-H1 and PD-1 by monoclonal antibodies potentiates cancer therapeutic immunity.", Cancer research, American Association for Cancer Research, US, US , (20050201), vol. 65, no. 3, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 1089 - 1096, XP002419626 | - Asís Palazón, Iván Martínez-Forero, Alvaro Teijeira, Aizea Morales-Kastresana, Carlos Alfaro, Miguel F. Sanmamed, Jose Luis Perez-Gracia, Iván Peñuelas, Sandra Hervás-Stubbs, Ana Rouzaut, Manuel Ortiz De Landázuri, Maria Jure-Kunkel, Julian Aragonés, Ignacio Melero, "The HIF-1α Hypoxia Response in Tumor-Infiltrating T Lymphocytes Induces Functional CD137 (4-1BB) for Immunotherapy", CANCER DISCOVERY, American Association for Cancer Research, US, US , (20120701), vol. 2, no. 7, doi:10.1158/2159-8290.CD-11-0314, ISSN 2159-8274, pages 608 - 623, XP055553245 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2159-8290.CD-11-0314 |