EP3036802 - COMMUNICATION CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panduit Corp. 18900 Panduit Drive Tinley Park, IL 60487 / US | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLOURI-SARANSAR, Masud 15205 Brassie Drive Orland Park, Illinois 60462 / US | 02 /
BABU, Surendra Chitti 2411 Foxwood Drive New Lenox, Illinois 60451 / US | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/40] |
Former [2016/26] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14761480.4 | 20.08.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014US51857 | Priority number, date | US201361867827P | 20.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361867827 P | US201361869886P | 26.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361869886 P | US201361870470P | 27.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361870470 P | US201414463145 | 19.08.2014 Original published format: US201414463145 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015026926 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3036802 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3036802 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/66, H01R24/64, H01R27/00, H01R29/00, H01R107/00 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
H01R24/64 (EP,US);
H01R13/648 (US);
H01R13/6658 (EP,US);
H01R27/00 (EP,US);
H01R29/00 (EP,US);
H01R4/24 (US);
H01R2107/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDER | [2016/26] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONNECTOR | [2016/26] | French: | CONNECTEUR DE COMMUNICATION | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 13.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.08.2014 | AL | 03.10.2018 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | ES | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | IT | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | MT | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 20.08.2014 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.08.2014 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US7255567 (LIAO SHENG-HSIN [TW]) [A] 1-22 * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 34; figures 1,2 ** column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 19 *; | [A]US2009142968 (GOODRICH ROBERT RAY [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0061]; figure 4 *; | [XAI]WO2013052436 (PANDUIT CORP [US], et al) [X] 10,12-18,21 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1,2,5,6,7,13 * [A] 1-9,11,20,22 [I] 19 |