EP3044740 - MASTER CASE TRACKING MESH FOR DATA TRANSMISSION IN HIGHLY SHIELDED ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sicpa Holding SA Av. de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANCHARD, Hubert Chemin du Chapon 5 1071 St-Saphorin / CH | 02 /
CASET, Giorgio Chemin de L'Esplanade 30 1052 Le Mont-sur-Lausanne / CH | 03 /
MARGUERETTAZ, Xavier Rue du Guercet 93 1920 Martigny / CH | 04 /
RAEMY, Xavier Cédric Route d'Arnier 40 1092 Belmont-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14761868.0 | 10.09.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014EP69326 | Priority number, date | US201361875924P | 10.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361875924 P | WO2013EP68759 | 10.09.2013 Original published format: PCT/EP2013/068759 | US201361882982P | 26.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361882982 P | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015036452 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044740 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0833 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Title | German: | MASTERFALLVERFOLGUNGSNETZ ZUR DATENÜBERTRAGUNG IN STARK ABGESCHIRMTEN UMGEBUNGEN | [2016/29] | English: | MASTER CASE TRACKING MESH FOR DATA TRANSMISSION IN HIGHLY SHIELDED ENVIRONMENT | [2016/29] | French: | MAILLAGE DE SUIVI DE CAISSE MAÎTRE POUR UNE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT HAUTEMENT PROTÉGÉ | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 24.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 09.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/41] | 21.05.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003137968 (LAREAU NEIL WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0049] *; | [A]US2004201454 (WATERHOUSE PAUL [CA], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]DE102005038244 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [I]US2007024449 (BILYEU SUZANNE [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0017] - [0020] - [0028] *; | [A]US2007164863 (HIMBERGER KEVIN D [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [I]US2007282716 (BRANIGAN JAMES PETER [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1895456 (CARGO TRAX OY [FI]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [I]WO2011025843 (SEITZ MARIA ESTELA [US]) [I] 1-14 * column 35 * * columns 52-54 * * column 58 * * column 67 *; | [A]WO2012125947 (EPROVENANCE LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013063251 (ALLEN MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |